Global Patent Index - EP 1061239 A2

EP 1061239 A2 2000-12-20 - Combustion control apparatus for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Combustion control apparatus for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Gerät zur Steuerung der Verbrennung für einen Verbrennungsmotor

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour commander la combustion d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1061239 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00112514 A

Priority

JP 16696199 A

Abstract (en)

An engine includes a variable valve timing mechanism (VVT 80) to adjust the valve overlap of intake valves (18) and exhaust valves (20) in accordance with the running state of the engine. The engine operates either in stratified charge combustion mode or in homogenous charge combustion mode in accordance with the running state of the engine. When, for example, the VVT (80) cannot operate normally due to lack of hydraulic pressure, an ECU (44) judges that the state of the VVT (80) is not suitable for stratified combustion and forces the engine to operate in the homogenous combustion mode regardless of the running state of the engine. As a result, the combustion state of the engine does not deteriorated and the amount of NOx in the exhaust gas does not increase. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04; F02D 41/22; F02D 41/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/34 (2006.01); F02B 17/00 (2006.01); F02D 13/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02D 41/30 (2006.01); F02D 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/221 (2013.01); F01L 1/34 (2013.01); F02D 13/0238 (2013.01); F02D 13/0261 (2013.01); F02D 41/0002 (2013.01); F02D 41/3076 (2013.01); F01L 2201/00 (2013.01); F01L 2800/00 (2013.01); F02D 41/3029 (2013.01); F02D 2041/001 (2013.01); Y02T 10/18 (2013.01); Y02T 10/42 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H05248277 A 19930924 - TOYOTA MOTOR CORP

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061239 A2 20001220; EP 1061239 A3 20021113; EP 1061239 B1 20070103; DE 60032670 D1 20070215; DE 60032670 T2 20071004; JP 2000356143 A 20001226; KR 20010007352 A 20010126; US 6311667 B1 20011106

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090613

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090613

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080618

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080619

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071005

2007-06-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60032670 P 20070215

2007-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-01-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI