Global Patent Index - EP 1061245 A2

EP 1061245 A2 2000-12-20 - Exhaust gas purifying system of internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Exhaust gas purifying system of internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Abgasreinigungssystem für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Système de purification de gaz d'échappement d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1061245 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00112088 A

Priority

JP 16670199 A

Abstract (en)

A catalyst is installed in an exhaust passage of an internal combustion engine. The catalyst is of a type that traps and stores NOx in the exhaust gas when the air/fuel ratio of the exhaust gas is higher than the stoichiometric ratio and reduces the stored NOx with the aid of reducing components in the exhaust gas when the air/fuel ratio of the exhaust gas is equal to or lower than the stoichiometric ratio. A detector detects operation load of the engine. A control unit includes a microprocessor that is programmed to carry out calculating the amount of the stored NOx when the air/fuel ratio of the exhaust gas is higher than the stoichiometric ratio; judging whether or not the catalyst needs recovering of the NOx-storing ability thereof in accordance with the calculated amount of the stored NOx; determining the amount of NOx to be reduced in accordance with the engine load detected by the detector; and carrying out a catalyst recovering control when the need of recovering the NOx-storing ability is judged. The catalyst recovering control is a control to keep the air/fuel ratio of the exhaust gas at a predetermined lower ratio for a predetermined period. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/14; F01N 3/20; F02D 41/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/20 (2006.01); F01N 3/08 (2006.01); F01N 3/24 (2006.01); F01N 3/28 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/0842 (2013.01); F02D 41/0275 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0806 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0811 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061245 A2 20001220; EP 1061245 A3 20011128; EP 1061245 B1 20030917; DE 60005251 D1 20031023; DE 60005251 T2 20040408; JP 2000356124 A 20001226; JP 3812223 B2 20060823

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160601

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160601

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60005251 P 20031023

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-08-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000605

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI