Global patent index - EP 1061262 A2

EP 1061262 A2 2000-12-20 - Turbo-molecular pump

Title (en)

Turbo-molecular pump

Title (de)

Turbomolekularpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe turbo-moléculaire

Publication

EP 1061262 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00112625 A

Priority

JP 16663799 A

Abstract (en)

A turbo-molecular pump includes a casing having an intake port (14a), a stator (S) fixedly mounted in the casing (14), and a rotor (R) supported in the casing (14) for rotation relatively to the stator. The stator and the rotor make up a turbine blade pumping section (L1) and a groove pumping section (L2) for evacuating gas. A scattering prevention member (50) is provided for preventing fragments of the rotor (R) from being scattered through the intake port (14a). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 19/04; F04D 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 19/04 (2006.01); F04D 29/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 19/042 (2013.01); F04D 29/701 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061262 A2 20001220; EP 1061262 A3 20020306; EP 1061262 B1 20071226; DE 60037554 D1 20080207; DE 60037554 T2 20090108; KR 20010007349 A 20010126

INPADOC legal status

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090614

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090614

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081017

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080604

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080929

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2008-02-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60037554

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-02-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-12-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2007-12-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060314

2002-11-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2002-10-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020826

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI