Global Patent Index - EP 1061265 A1

EP 1061265 A1 2000-12-20 - Turbocharger for a slow speed diesel engine

Title (en)

Turbocharger for a slow speed diesel engine

Title (de)

Aufladegruppe für einen Grossdieselmotor

Title (fr)

Groupe de suralimentation pour un gros moteur diesel

Publication

EP 1061265 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810411 A

Priority

  • EP 00810411 A
  • EP 99810521 A

Abstract (en)

The blower group has a compressor (2), which supplies air to the motor cylinders. The compressor has an impeller (21) rotating about an axle (A) to compress the air. A turbine drives the impeller and is driven by exhaust gases from the cylinders. A diffuser (4) connected to the compressor outlet (23) reduces the flow speed of the compressed air. The compressor outlet is arranged at a higher level, on or above the compressor axle. An Independent claim is included for a large diesel motor incorporating the blower group.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Aufladegruppe für einen Grossdieselmotor vorgeschlagen, mit einem Verdichter (2) zum Verdichten von Luft, die als Spülluft Zylindern (11) des Grossdieselmotors (10) zugeführt wird, welcher Verdichter (2) einen Auslass (23) für die verdichtete Luft sowie ein auf einer Achse (A) angeordnetes Laufrad (21) zum Verdichten der Luft aufweist, mit einer Turbine (3) zum Antreiben des Laufrads (21) des Verdichters (2), wobei die Turbine (3) mit Abgasen aus den Zylindern (11) antreibbar ist, und mit einem Diffusor (4) zum Reduzieren der Strömungsgeschwindigkeit der verdichteten Luft, welcher mit dem Auslass (23) des Verdichters (2) verbunden ist, wobei der Auslass (23) des Verdichters (2) auf einem Höhenniveau angeordnet ist, welches bezüglich der normalen Gebrauchslage auf oder oberhalb der Achse (A) des Verdichters (2) liegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/44; F04D 25/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 39/00 (2006.01); F02B 33/44 (2006.01); F02B 37/00 (2006.01); F02B 41/00 (2006.01); F04D 25/04 (2006.01); F04D 29/44 (2006.01); F02B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/441 (2013.01); F02B 3/06 (2013.01); F02F 2007/0097 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061265 A1 20001220; EP 1061265 B1 20051214; CN 1175189 C 20041110; CN 1277317 A 20001220; DE 50011843 D1 20060119; DK 1061265 T3 20060206; JP 2001020747 A 20010123; KR 100659677 B1 20061221; KR 20010007159 A 20010126; PL 340532 A1 20001218

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-01 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20070324

2006-10-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ABB TURBO SYSTEMS AG

- Effective date: 20060914

2006-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-17 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060517

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2006-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50011843

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-01-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-12-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR IT

2005-09-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WAERTSILAE SCHWEIZ AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE DK FR IT

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010516

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR IT

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI