Global Patent Index - EP 1061268 A2

EP 1061268 A2 2000-12-20 - Rodside damping in single-acting cylinders

Title (en)

Rodside damping in single-acting cylinders

Title (de)

Führungsseitige Dämpfung in einfach wirkenden Arbeitszylindern

Title (fr)

Amortissement dans le côté de guidage des vérins

Publication

EP 1061268 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109759 A

Priority

DE 29910610 U

Abstract (en)

The cylinder (1) consists of a cylinder tube (3) and a damping tube (4) connected to the cylinder tube. The damping tube has a flow off notch (23) which extends along the entire length of the cylinder. The central axis (24) of the notch is inclined with respect to the central axis of the cylinder at a tangent of 0.02 to 0.3.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezeichnet einen fluidbetriebenen, vorzugsweise einfach wirkenden Arbeitszylinder mit führungsseitiger Dämpfung, dessen Dämpfungsstrecke und Dämpfungscharakteristik dem jeweiligen Einsatzgebiet einfach anpaßbar ist, keine mechanisch wirkenden Bauteile aufweist, keine zusätzlichen äußeren oder inneren Verbindungen mit hohem Fertigungsaufwand oder großer radialer Ausdehnung benötigt und durch eine progressive Dämpfungscharakteristik die schonende Bewegung von Massen bzw. Kräften in getriebetechnischen Systemen ermöglicht sowie kostengünstig herstellbar ist. Erfindungsgemäß wird die Aufgabe dadurch gelöst, daß ein Arbeitszylinder (1) aus einem Zylinderrohr (3) und einem mit diesem verbundenen Dämpfungsrohr (4) besteht und, daß das Dämpfungsrohr (4) an seiner Innenmantelfläche (25) eine sich über dessen gesamte Länge erstreckenden Abströmkerbe (23) aufweist, deren Mittelachse (24), gegenüber der Zentralachse (2) des Arbeitszylinders (1), in einem Winkel mit dem Wert tan =0,02 bis 0,3 geneigt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/22; F15B 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/14 (2006.01); F15B 15/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/222 (2013.01); F15B 15/1428 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29910610 U1 19990916; AT 298044 T 20050715; EP 1061268 A2 20001220; EP 1061268 A3 20031029; EP 1061268 B1 20050615

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110509

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110509

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110509

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 298044 T

- Effective date: 20110509

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110509

2011-12-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111201

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100504

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100514

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100531

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100610

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100329

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-06-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060316

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010547 P 20050721

2005-07-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2005-06-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-06 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2001-02-07 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2001-02-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI