Global Patent Index - EP 1061320 A2

EP 1061320 A2 2000-12-20 - Heat exchanger with U-tubes, provided with a damping and anti- blowout device for securing tubes

Title (en)

Heat exchanger with U-tubes, provided with a damping and anti- blowout device for securing tubes

Title (de)

Wärmetauscher mit U-Röhren, mit einer Anti-Auftrieb- und schwingungsneutralisierender Rohrhalterungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur, à tubes en U, équipé d'un dispositif de calage des tubes antivibratoire et anti-envol

Publication

EP 1061320 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00121012 A

Priority

  • EP 96400463 A
  • FR 9502745 A

Abstract (en)

The heat exchanger consists of of a shell containing a series of U-tubes (10) with parallel straight sides, and anti-vibration bars (15) between the curved sections of groups of tubes. The outer ends of the bars, projecting beyond the tubes, are linked by combs (21) with notches (21a) to receive the bar ends, and covers (22) with fixing screws (23) over the gaps between the notches. The anti-vibration bars can also have notches to engage with the combs and prevent any relative movement between the bars and combs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/013; F22B 37/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F22B 1/16 (2006.01); F22B 37/20 (2006.01); F28D 1/06 (2006.01); F28D 7/06 (2006.01); F28F 9/013 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 7/06 (2013.01); F22B 37/206 (2013.01); F28F 9/0132 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0731328 A1 19960911; EP 0731328 B1 20010425; CN 1099020 C 20030115; CN 1160183 A 19970924; DE 69612581 D1 20010531; DE 69612581 T2 20010906; EP 1061320 A2 20001220; EP 1061320 A3 20010117; FR 2731508 A1 19960913; FR 2731508 B1 19970509; JP 2006105589 A 20060420; JP 3773980 B2 20060510; JP 3923991 B2 20070606; JP H08261404 A 19961011; KR 100397689 B1 20031231; TW 307876 B 19970611; US 5692557 A 19971202

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160308

2015-11-25 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20151026

2010-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100105

2007-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AREVA NP

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE GB SE

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-12-20 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 731328

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB SE