Global Patent Index - EP 1061320 A3

EP 1061320 A3 2001-01-17 - Heat exchanger with U-tubes, provided with a damping and anti- blowout device for securing tubes

Title (en)

Heat exchanger with U-tubes, provided with a damping and anti- blowout device for securing tubes

Title (de)

Wärmetauscher mit U-Röhren, mit einer Anti-Auftrieb- und schwingungsneutralisierender Rohrhalterungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur, à tubes en U, équipé d'un dispositif de calage des tubes antivibratoire et anti-envol

Publication

EP 1061320 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 00121012 A

Priority

  • EP 96400463 A
  • FR 9502745 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0731328A1] The heat exchanger comprises a bundle of tubes (10) bent in a U shape, with a curved section between two straight legs. The tubes are arranged regularly, with all the legs parallel. A bundle envelope (4) surrounds the tube bundle and a number of antivibration bars (15) clamp between adjacent curved tube sections, forming an external bundle end. Connections (20) between these external bar ends, with a support (40), fixed to the bundle envelope, prevent movement. Thus only limited movement of the anti vibration bars and fixings is permitted on a direction parallel to the tube legs. The connections may each comprise a notched (21a) comb (21), receiving the bar ends, with a comb cover (22) and fixings (23).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/013; F22B 37/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F22B 1/16 (2006.01); F22B 37/20 (2006.01); F28D 1/06 (2006.01); F28D 7/06 (2006.01); F28F 9/013 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 7/06 (2013.01); F22B 37/206 (2013.01); F28F 9/0132 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0731328 A1 19960911; EP 0731328 B1 20010425; CN 1099020 C 20030115; CN 1160183 A 19970924; DE 69612581 D1 20010531; DE 69612581 T2 20010906; EP 1061320 A2 20001220; EP 1061320 A3 20010117; FR 2731508 A1 19960913; FR 2731508 B1 19970509; JP 2006105589 A 20060420; JP 3773980 B2 20060510; JP 3923991 B2 20070606; JP H08261404 A 19961011; KR 100397689 B1 20031231; TW 307876 B 19970611; US 5692557 A 19971202

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160308

2015-11-25 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20151026

2010-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100105

2007-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AREVA NP

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE GB SE

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-12-20 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 731328

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB SE