Global Patent Index - EP 1061323 A2

EP 1061323 A2 2000-12-20 - Armoured vehicle for the transport of soldiers

Title (en)

Armoured vehicle for the transport of soldiers

Title (de)

Gepanzertes Transportkraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Véhicule blindé pour le transport de soldats

Publication

EP 1061323 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110787 A

Priority

DE 19927656 A

Abstract (en)

The armoured personnel carrier has a turret (1) with adaptor cradle (24.1,24.2) to allow the inseretion of weapons (MW') and magazines varying from heavy machine gun to light cannon.

Abstract (de)

Ein gepanzertes Transportkraftfahrzeug (GTK) mit einer von einem Räder- oder Kettenlaufwerk getragenen Fahrzeugwanne (FW), Ein/Ausstiegsluken im Dach- und/oder Heckbereich der Fahrzeugwanne sowie einer Bordmaschinenwaffe (MW), welche über Schildzapfen in einer Lafette aufgehängt ist, die über einen Drehkranz auf dem Dach der Fahrzeugwanne gelagert ist. Die Lafette ist als unbemannter flacher Schartenturm (1) ausgebildet und Lafette und Bordmaschinenwaffe sind aus dem Fahrzeuginneren heraus fernbedienbar ausgebildet. Die zur Fernbedienung erforderliche elektrische Energie und elektrische Signale werden über einen Schleifring in den Schartenturm (1) übertragen. Der Schartenturm (1) ist derart ausgebildet, daß zur Aufnahmemöglichkeit von Bordmaschinenwaffen vom Kaliber 12,7 mm bis 30 mm der vertikale Abstand der Schildzapfenachse (D2) von Dachoberseite (E1) der Fahrzeugwanne (FW) mindestens 490 mm und der horizontale Abstand in Längsrichtung des Schartenturms (1) zwischen der die Schildzapfenachse (D2) enthaltenden vertikalen Ebene (E2) und der Achse (D1) des Drehkranzes (3) höchstens 30 mm beträgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 7/02; F41A 23/34; F41A 27/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 23/24 (2006.01); F41A 27/18 (2006.01); F41H 5/20 (2006.01); F41H 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 7/02 (2013.01); F41A 23/24 (2013.01); F41A 27/18 (2013.01); F41H 5/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061323 A2 20001220; EP 1061323 A3 20020130; EP 1061323 B1 20030709; EP 1061323 B2 20080109; AT 244866 T 20030715; DE 19927656 A1 20001221; ES 2201972 T3 20040401; ES 2201972 T5 20080601; PL 194992 B1 20070731; PL 340750 A1 20001218; TR 200001748 A2 20010122; TR 200001748 A3 20010122; ZA 200003022 B 20010109

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140520

2015-02-02 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20080400710

- Effective date: 20141203

2015-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141203

2015-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 244866 T

- Effective date: 20140520

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2013-08-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120521

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-09-12 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KRAUSS-MAFFEI WEGMANN GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: KRAUSS-MAFFEI WEGMANN GMBH & CO. KG#AUGUST-BODE-STRASSE 1#34127 KASSEL (DE) -TRANSFER TO- KRAUSS-MAFFEI WEGMANN GMBH & CO. KG#AUGUST-BODE-STRASSE 1#34127 KASSEL (DE)

2008-06-02 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2008-06-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2008-04-16 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080326

2008-04-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20080400710

2008-03-18 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2008-03-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20080109

2008-01-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2008-01-09 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20080109

2008-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2005-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: RHEINMETALL LANDSYSTEME GMBH

2004-12-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: RHEINMETALL LANDSYSTEME GMBH

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-08-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: RHEINMETALL LANDSYSTEME GMBH

2004-05-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: RHEINMETALL LANDSYSTEME GMBH

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-02-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-10-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-10-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030403827

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002804 P 20030814

2003-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020121

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 41H 7/02 A, 7F 41A 23/34 B, 7F 41A 27/18 B, 7F 41H 5/20 B, 7F 41H 7/04 B, 7F 41A 23/24 B

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI