Global Patent Index - EP 1061351 A1

EP 1061351 A1 2000-12-20 - Ceramic capacitance pressure sensor

Title (en)

Ceramic capacitance pressure sensor

Title (de)

Kapazitiver keramischer Relativdruck-Sensor

Title (fr)

Capteur de pression capacitif en céramique

Publication

EP 1061351 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99111580 A

Priority

EP 99111580 A

Abstract (en)

The relative pressure sensor includes a diaphragm (11) with a first electrode (14) applied to its surface. A hole (23) is provided in a base body (12) for guiding reference air from a first surface to an opposing second surface. The first surface is polished and a second electrode (15) is applied to it. The base body and diaphragm are soldered or brazed together at the edge, with spacers (20) forming a chamber (13). The chamber is covered from the inside with a thin layer (24) of hydrophobic material which is brought in through the hole (23) after the soldering or brazing.

Abstract (de)

Dieser Relativdruck-Sensor (10) soll bei relativen Feuchten, die bis nahe an die Sättigungsgrenze heranreichen, praktisch keinen Offset des Nullpunkts aufweisen. Der Sensor hat eine Membran (11), die eine Oberfläche aufweist, auf der eine Elektrode (13) aufgebracht ist. Der Sensor hat auch einen Grundkörper (12), der eine Bohrung (23) zur Führung von Referenzluft von der einen Oberfläche zu der gegenüberliegenden Oberfläche aufweist. Die eine Oberfläche ist poliert, und auf ihr ist mindestens eine weitere Elektrode (15) aufgebracht. Der Grundkörper (12) und die Membran (11) sind am Rand mittels eines Abstandhalters (20) unter Bildung einer Kammer (13) miteinander verlötet oder hartverlötet. Die Kammer ist mit einer nach dem Verlöten oder Hartverlöten durch die Bohrung (23) eingebrachten dünnen Schicht (24) aus einem hydrophoben Material von innen bedeckt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01L 9/00; G01L 19/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01L 9/12 (2006.01); G01L 9/00 (2006.01); G01L 13/06 (2006.01); G01L 19/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01L 19/0654 (2013.01); G01L 9/0075 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DA] US 5050034 A 19910917 - HEGNER FRANK [DE], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 11 29 November 1996 (1996-11-29)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061351 A1 20001220; EP 1061351 B1 20030806; CA 2311569 A1 20001215; CA 2311569 C 20040127; DE 59906514 D1 20030911; DK 1061351 T3 20031103; JP 2001021430 A 20010126; JP 3205327 B2 20010904

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130615

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130615

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090615

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-02-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080624

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080610

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-11-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906514 P 20030911

2003-08-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

2003-08-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030806

2002-08-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020705

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENDRESS + HAUSER GMBH + CO.KG.

2001-09-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE DK FR LI

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010118

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENDRESS + HAUSER GMBH + CO.

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI