Global Patent Index - EP 1061414 A1

EP 1061414 A1 2000-12-20 - Developer composition for use in the processing of light-sensitive silver halide photographic materials

Title (en)

Developer composition for use in the processing of light-sensitive silver halide photographic materials

Title (de)

Entwicklerzusammensetzung zur Verarbeitung photographischer lichtempfindlicher Silberhalogenidmaterialien

Title (fr)

Composition développatrice pour le traitement de matériaux photographiques à l'halogénure d'argent sensibles à la lumière

Publication

EP 1061414 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00201853 A

Priority

  • EP 00201853 A
  • EP 99201892 A

Abstract (en)

A black-and-white silver halide developer composition has been disclosed comprising, besides one or more developing agent(s), agent(s) preventing oxidation thereof and agent(s) providing pH buffering, at least one silver complexing agent, characterized in that said silver complexing agent has a silver complexing stability ratio of at least 70 % and, besides said silver complexing agent, at least one agent preventing silver dissolution characterized in that said agent preventing silver dissolution, if present in an amount of 50 mg/l of developer, makes silver content of the developer decrease in an amount of more than 50 % versus in the absence thereof, without loss in speed in an amount of more than 0.10 log Exposure after processing in said developer composition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 5/305

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/305 (2006.01); G03C 5/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/305 (2013.01); G03C 5/30 (2013.01); G03C 5/3053 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. G03C 5/30 + G03C 2005/3007 + G03C 2200/34 + G03C 5/3035
  2. G03C 5/305 + G03C 2200/40

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061414 A1 20001220

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040402

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010620

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI