Global Patent Index - EP 1061415 A1

EP 1061415 A1 2000-12-20 - Black-and-white developer

Title (en)

Black-and-white developer

Title (de)

Schwarz-Weiss-Entwickler

Title (fr)

Révélateur noir-et-blanc

Publication

EP 1061415 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00202104 A

Priority

  • DE 19928157 A
  • DE 19939392 A

Abstract (en)

Black-and-white developer for silver halide materials contains a developer substance combination of (a) an (iso)ascorbic salt (I) and (b) a p-aminophenol (II), together with 1-phenyl-5-mercaptotetrazole (III) as stabilizer. Black-and-white developer for silver halide materials contains a developer substance combination of (a) an (iso)ascorbic salt (I) and (b) a p-aminophenol of formula (II), together with 1-phenyl-5-mercaptotetrazole (III) as stabilizer; R1-6 = hydrogen (H), alkyl, (substituted) alkyl, (substituted) acyloxy or a group of the formula (X)p-A-(sol);;or NR1R2 = a 5-6-membered saturated ring; p = 0 or 1; X = oxygen (-O-), sulfur (-S-) or imino (-NR7-); R7 = H, alkyl or A-(Sol); A = a single bond, alkylene, phenylene, alkylene-phenylene or phenylene-alkylene group of the formulae (IIa) q = 0-5; y = 1-3; (Sol) = a solubilizing group selected from carboxyl (CO2H), sulfo (SO3H), alkyl- or aryl-sulfonylamino (NHSO2R8), aminosulfonyl (SO2NHR8), polyhydroxyalkyl or an acyl-or cyano-sulfomethyl group of the formulae (IIb); R8 = alkyl or aryl; R9 = hydroxyl (OH), alkyl or aryl; R10 = H, alkyl or aryl.

Abstract (de)

Mit einem Schwarz-Weiß-Entwickler für Silberhalogenidmaterialien, der als Entwicklersubstanz eine Kombination aus (a) einem Salz der Ascorbinsäure oder Isoascorbinsäure und (b) einer Verbindung der Formel (E-2) <IMAGE> worin R1 bis R6 die in der Beschreibung angegebene Bedeutung besitzen, sowie als Stabilisator 1-Phenyl-5-mercaptotetrazol enthält, wird bei ausgezeichnetem sensitometrischem Resultat ein blauschwarzer Bildton erzielt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 5/305; G03C 5/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/30 (2006.01); G03C 5/305 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/30 (2013.01); G03C 5/305 (2013.01); G03C 2005/3007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061415 A1 20001220

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060102

2004-08-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010620

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI