Global patent index - EP 1061416 A1

EP 1061416 A1 2000-12-20 - Colour photographic developer concentrate

Title (en)

Colour photographic developer concentrate

Title (de)

Photographisches Farbentwicklerkonzentrat

Title (fr)

Révélateur pour la photographie en couleur sous forme concentrée

Publication

EP 1061416 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00201918 A

Priority

DE 19927601 A

Abstract (en)

A two-part colour photographic developer concentrate in which part 1 contains at least one antioxidant, at least one auxiliary solvent, at least one optical brightener and at least one colour developer substance and part 2 contains at least one buffer substance, alkali and at least one water softener, may be produced by part 1 additionally containing 0.001 to 1 mol of hydroxylamine or a monoalkylated hydroxylamine or the salts thereof per litre of concentrate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 7/407; G03C 7/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/413 (2006.01); G03C 5/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/413 (2013.01); G03C 5/266 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

G03C 7/413 + G03C 2200/44

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061416 A1 20001220; DE 19927601 A1 20010111

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-23 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20040928

2004-07-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010620

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI