Global Patent Index - EP 1061429 A1

EP 1061429 A1 2000-12-20 - Retractable rotary knob

Title (en)

Retractable rotary knob

Title (de)

Versenkbarer Drehknopf

Title (fr)

Bouton tournant escamotable

Publication

EP 1061429 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00111452 A

Priority

DE 19928229 A

Abstract (en)

The rotary knob has a socket in which an axially displaceable operating member is located. The socket and the operating member are connected together via a spring member (3) for exerting an axial force on the operating member. The socket has a guide with two end positions arranged axially, one behind the other, for a locking element (7) that defines an operating position and a stowed position. The locking element is integrated in the spring member (3). The spring member may be a coil spring.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein vereinfachter versenkbarer Drehknopf vorgeschlagen, bei dem ein Betätigungselement (2) gegenüber einem Lagerelement (1) mit beziehungsweise gegen die Kraft einer Spiralfeder (3) axial verschiebbar ist. Durch ein Rastelement (7), das in einer Führungsbahn (5) geführt wird, werden eine Ruhestellung und eine Betätigungsstellung des Betätigungselementes (2) festgelegt. Erfindungsgemäß ist vorgesehen, daß das Rastelement (7) in die Spiralfeder (3) integriert ist. Hierdurch wird ein vereinfachter Zusammenbau des Drehknopfes erreicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05G 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05G 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05G 1/087 (2013.01); H01H 2003/085 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061429 A1 20001220; EP 1061429 B1 20060705; DE 19928229 A1 20001221; DE 50013109 D1 20060817; US 6410871 B1 20020625

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50013109

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120601

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120531

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090527

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090527

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070410

2007-01-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060927

2006-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013109 P 20060817

2006-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-07-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010522

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI