Global Patent Index - EP 1061487 A1

EP 1061487 A1 2000-12-20 - A method and device for automatically controlling a region in space

Title (en)

A method and device for automatically controlling a region in space

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur automatischen Kontrolle einer Raumregion

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif de contrôle automatique d'une région de l'espace

Publication

EP 1061487 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830376 A

Priority

EP 99830376 A

Abstract (en)

The monitored region (S) is monitored by image signal generating means such as video cameras (2) in order to obtain a succession of images of the bodies (A, B) present in the monitored region, each image corresponding to a defined instant. The images are processed in such a way as to obtain, for each instant considered, a volumetric map of each body present in the region (S). This map, which identifies characteristics of shape, position, volume and dimensions of the body to which it refers, is processed in order to extract from it at least one parameter selected from the following group: descriptors of shape and volume, such as the volumetric map itself, the co-ordinates of position and the dimensions of each body to which the volumetric map refers. The parameter or a succession of values of the parameter obtained in this way is then compared with at least one model of these characteristics stored in a processing unit (1). Depending on the outcome of this comparison operation, a procedure of surveillance and/or reporting may be selectively activated. The solution is applicable, for example, to the automatic monitoring of museum environments, e.g. to ensure that visitors do not come too close to an exhibited work, or to the monitoring of industrial environments, e.g. to ensure that an operator does not come too close to a dangerous machine or process. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/194

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/194 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/19602 (2013.01); G08B 13/19641 (2013.01); G08B 13/19652 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] EP 0356734 A2 19900307 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
  • [Y] TARBOX G H ET AL: "VOLUMETRIC BASED INSPECTION*", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE/RSJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, vol. -, pages 1239-1246, XP000334081, ISBN: 0-7803-0738-0
  • [A] CARLSON J ET AL: "Real-time 3D visualization of volumetric video motion sensor data", SURVEILLANCE AND ASSESSMENT TECHNOLOGIES FOR LAW ENFORCEMENT, BOSTON, MA, USA, 19-20 NOV. 1996, vol. 2935, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering, 1997, SPIE-Int. Soc. Opt. Eng, USA, pages 69 - 79, XP000863382, ISSN: 0277-786X

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061487 A1 20001220

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-05-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI