Global patent index - EP 1061492 A1

EP 1061492 A1 2000-12-20 - Device to maintain a traffic light system

Title (en)

Device to maintain a traffic light system

Title (de)

Gerät zur Wartung einer Verkehrslichtsignalanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la maintenance d'un système de feux de signalisation

Publication

EP 1061492 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401730 A

Priority

FR 9907783 A

Abstract (en)

A portable computer (6) permits updating, processing and storage of data in the module during its maintenance. The computer (6) also permits transfers with internal devices (61,65,65') of computer. A bi-directional communication may be maintained between the modules and the collection computer through respective communication interfaces (55,65,65') in order to permit bi-directional data exchange. Independent claims are included for: (a) a data collection device; and (b) an electronic module.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/095

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/095 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/095 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061492 A1 20001220; FR 2795215 A1 20001222; FR 2795215 B1 20021129

INPADOC legal status

2006-09-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060322

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030709

2001-10-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CY DE

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010620

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI