Global patent index - EP 1061534 A2

EP 1061534 A2 2000-12-20 - Soft magnetic, deformable composite material and process for producing the same

Title (en)

Soft magnetic, deformable composite material and process for producing the same

Title (de)

Weichmagnetischer, formbarer Verbundwerkstoff und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Matériau composite magnétique doux déformable et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1061534 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119956 A

Priority

  • DE 19735271 A
  • EP 98948761 A

Abstract (en)

The material is made up of a powder which has weakly magnetic properties. The powder grains or granules are coated with the non- magnetic thermoplastic binder. The binder is preferably insoluble in organic aliphatic solvents. Independent claims are also included to a substance made of weakly magnetic powder granules coated with an aluminum compound, and to a method of manufacturing the substance.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein weichmagnetischer, formbarer Verbundwerkstoff vorgeschlagen, der ein weichmagnetische Eigenschaften aufweisendes Pulver und mindestens eine Silizium enthaltende Verbindung oder eine Aluminium enthaltene Verbindung oder eine Bor enthaltende Verbindung aufweist, wobei die Körner des Pulvers mit der Siliziumverbindung, der Aluminiumverbindung oder der Borverbindung beschichtet sind. Weiter wird ein Verfahren zur Herstellung eines solchen weichmagnetischen Verbundwerkstoffes vorgeschlagen, wobei nach einem Formpreßschritt des Verbundwerkstoffes der Formpreßling einer thermischen Behandlung unterworfen wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 1/24; H01F 41/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 1/24 (2006.01); H01F 1/26 (2006.01); H01F 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 1/26 (2013.01); H01F 1/24 (2013.01); H01F 41/0246 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19735271 A1 19990225; DE 19735271 C2 20000504; EP 0931322 A1 19990728; EP 0931322 B1 20030521; EP 1061534 A2 20001220; EP 1061534 A3 20001227; JP 2001504283 A 20010327; US 6537389 B1 20030325; WO 9909565 A1 19990225

INPADOC legal status

2005-08-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050218

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021015

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010627

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-12-20 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 931322

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT