Global patent index - EP 1061540 A2

EP 1061540 A2 2000-12-20 - Rail mounted device

Title (en)

Rail mounted device

Title (de)

Reiheneinbaugerät

Title (fr)

Appareil à monter en rangée

Publication

EP 1061540 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111987 A

Priority

DE 19927984 A

Abstract (en)

The movable contact arm (24) is coupled to a central carrier (33) that moves against a spring (29) when displaced by the input . This can be in the form of a rocker (16) . When moved the carrier moves the contact arm until the movable contact (23) engages a fixed one in the base and latches with a spring indent (34)

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verteilereinbaugerät, wie beispielsweise ein Gruppenschalter, ein Taster oder ein Leuchtmelder, ist zur Erhöhung der gemeinsamen Teile ein Gehäuse 10, in dem wenigstens eine mittels eines Schaltmechanismuses 27 von außen betätigbare Kontaktpaarungen aus wenigstens einem festen und einem bewegbaren Kontakt 23, 25, 26 angeordnet ist, vorgesehen, wobei jeder bewegbare Kontakt 23 mittels eines Schuborgans 27 entgegen der Druckkraft eines Federorgans 29 aus einer ersten Stellung über eine Zwischenstellung in eine zweite Stellung bewegbar ist. Für die Ausbildung als Gruppenschalter greift ein Rastorgan 34 zur Sicherung der drei Stellungen ein, während zur Ausbildung als Taster oder Leuchtmelder das Rastorgan weggelassen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 11/00; H01H 21/84

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 11/00 (2006.01); H01H 71/02 (2006.01); H01H 71/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 11/0018 (2013.01); H01H 71/0207 (2013.01); H01H 71/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 19927984 A1 20001221; EP 1061540 A2 20001220; EP 1061540 A3 20020807; EP 1061540 B1 20050420

INPADOC legal status

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100226

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060123

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50010078

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-05-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-05-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021015

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI