Global Patent Index - EP 1061542 A1

EP 1061542 A1 2000-12-20 - Electromagnetic multipolar switch

Title (en)

Electromagnetic multipolar switch

Title (de)

Elektromagnetischer mehrpoliger Schalter

Title (fr)

Appareil électromagnétique de commutation de type multipolaire

Publication

EP 1061542 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401709 A

Priority

  • FR 9907879 A
  • FR 0005670 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1061541A1] The commutation poles (C1,C2,C3) and the current lines are arranged within the module housing to realise a motor control function of reverse, star-delta, or distributor type. The pole control unit constituted by an electromagnet (E1) and its control circuit, displaced relative to the commutation poles and current lines in a direction perpendicular to the rear mounting wall of the module. The size of the module is thus reduced and approximately equal to that of the main associated apparatus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 51/00; H01H 1/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/06 (2006.01); H01H 1/54 (2006.01); H01H 9/26 (2006.01); H01H 47/00 (2006.01); H01H 51/00 (2006.01); H01H 51/24 (2006.01); H02P 1/30 (2006.01); H02P 1/40 (2006.01); H02P 3/20 (2006.01); H02P 5/00 (2006.01); H01H 89/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/54 (2013.01); H01H 51/005 (2013.01); H01H 89/06 (2013.01); Y10T 307/839 (2015.04); Y10T 307/977 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061542 A1 20001220; EP 1061542 B1 20060510; AR 024383 A1 20021002; AT 339772 T 20061015; AU 4090100 A 20001221; AU 770846 B2 20040304; BR 0002689 A 20010130; BR PI0002689 B1 20160531; CA 2312254 A1 20001218; CA 2312254 C 20081007; CN 1148766 C 20040505; CN 1291780 A 20010418; DE 60027819 D1 20060614; DE 60027819 T2 20061102; DE 60030627 D1 20061026; DE 60030627 T2 20070913; DZ 3054 A1 20040327; EP 1061541 A1 20001220; EP 1061541 B1 20060913; ES 2267474 T3 20070316; FR 2795227 A1 20001222; FR 2795227 B3 20010720; HU 0002283 A2 20010228; HU 0002283 A3 20010628; HU 0002283 D0 20000828; HU 223173 B1 20040329; ID 26375 A 20001221; JP 2001057798 A 20010227; JP 4472123 B2 20100602; MA 25289 A1 20011231; MY 125529 A 20060830; NO 20003152 A 20001219; NO 20003152 D0 20000616; NO 318941 B1 20050530; RU 2219616 C2 20031220; TN SN00135 A1 20030403; TR 200001848 A2 20010122; TR 200001848 A3 20010122; TW 484155 B 20020421; US 6304049 B1 20011016; US 6472837 B1 20021029

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160616

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160504

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160503

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-04 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070616

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070616

2007-04-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070213

2006-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060906

2006-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60027819 P 20060614

2006-06-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060609

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-05-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRONIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI