Global Patent Index - EP 1061556 A1

EP 1061556 A1 2000-12-20 - Lamp for a headlight provided with a reflector

Title (en)

Lamp for a headlight provided with a reflector

Title (de)

Lampe für Scheinwerfer mit einem Reflektor

Title (fr)

Lampe pour projecteur muni d'un réflecteur

Publication

EP 1061556 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00202012 A

Priority

FR 9907562 A

Abstract (en)

The incandescent lamp has a filament consisting of several filament segments each made in a rectilinear spiral parallel to each other and arranged in several layers, see Fig. 3. In a group of filament segments, the rectilinear filaments are arranged along a virtual developed curve. The lamp has a first group of filaments (1,2,3,4) arranged along a first developed curved surface (30A) and a second group of filaments (5,6,7,8) along a second developed curved surface (30B).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01K 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01K 1/18 (2006.01); H01K 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01K 1/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061556 A1 20001220; EP 1061556 B1 20050330; CN 1124429 C 20031015; CN 1280269 A 20010117; DE 60019023 D1 20050504; DE 60019023 T2 20060330; FR 2795232 A1 20001222; JP 2001015085 A 20010119; JP 4603656 B2 20101222; US 6525452 B1 20030225

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60019023

- Effective date: 20140101

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120607

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120607

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120830

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110630

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060102

2005-07-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60019023 P 20050504

2005-03-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-03-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010620

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI