Global Patent Index - EP 1061611 A2

EP 1061611 A2 2000-12-20 - Strain relief device for electrical cables

Title (en)

Strain relief device for electrical cables

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Zugentlastung für Kabel

Title (fr)

Dispositif de relaxation des contraintes pour câbles électriques

Publication

EP 1061611 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110099 A

Priority

DE 19926347 A

Abstract (en)

The device includes a cable receptacle (4) with a clamp (16). The clamp is slidable on a surface (14) that is inclined to the longitudinal axis (28) of the cable (7), and lockable by means of a pressing member (29). The cable receptacle consists of two cable cavities with parallel side walls, and side walls (11) forming the inclined surface. The side walls (11) have guide fins (15) which engage in U-shaped groves in the clamp.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Einrichtung zur Zugentlastung für Kabel in der Telekommunations- und Datentechnik, mit einer Kabelaufnahme und einem dieser zugeordneten Klemmteil. Um die Zugentlastung bei geschirmten Kabeln zu verbessern ist das Klemmteil (16) auf einer der Kabelaufnahme (4) zugeordneten, gegen die Längsachse (28) der Kabel (7) geneigten Schrägfläche (14) gleitbar und mittels eines Drückelementes (29) arretierbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/5812 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061611 A2 20001220; EP 1061611 A3 20030312; DE 19926347 A1 20010419; DE 19926347 C2 20021031

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-12-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030313

- Countries: AL

2003-12-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030313

- Countries: LT

2003-12-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030313

- Countries: LV

2003-12-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030313

- Countries: MK

2003-12-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030313

- Countries: RO

2003-12-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030313

- Countries: SI

2003-07-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/58 A

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030130

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/56 A

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/58 B

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI