Global Patent Index - EP 1061747 A1

EP 1061747 A1 2000-12-20 - Method and apparatus for block motion estimation

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for block motion estimation

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur block-bewegungsschätzung

Title (fr)

Méthode et appareil pour estimation de mouvement de bloc

Publication

EP 1061747 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00110315 A

Priority

  • EP 00110315 A
  • EP 99110116 A

Abstract (en)

For block motion estimation the current frames are divided into blocks and the picture elements of each block are compared with the picture elements within a search area of a reference frame in order to determine a motion vector. According to the invention the processing requirements are reduced by parallel processing, wherein the search area (SA) is separated into search area stripes (St0, St1,... ) with a width equal to the block width (n). The picture elements of k neighboring blocks (A0,..., Ak-1) are compared with the picture elements of the search area stripes until the complete search area for a block has been processed. A block, for which the complete search area has been processed, is substituted by an unprocessed block. In an advantageous manner, the lines of the current frame are separated into block sections comprising k neighboring blocks, wherein the horizontal width of the block sections is equal to the horizontal width of the search area (wh). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 19/433 (2014.11); H04N 19/51 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] US 5784108 A 19980721 - SKALETZKY GIL [IL], et al
  • [XA] ARTIERI A ET AL: "A CHIP SET CORE FOR IMAGE COMPRESSION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, vol. 36, no. 3, 1 August 1990 (1990-08-01), pages 395 - 402, XP000162866, ISSN: 0098-3063
  • [A] DE SA L ET AL: "A PARALLEL ARCHITECTURE FOR REAL-TIME VIDEO CODING", MICROPROCESSING AND MICROPROGRAMMING, vol. 30, no. 1 / 05, 1 August 1990 (1990-08-01), pages 439 - 445, XP000141680, ISSN: 0165-6074

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061747 A1 20001220

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051201

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010522

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI