Global Patent Index - EP 1061772 A2

EP 1061772 A2 2000-12-20 - Tubular body for sound transmission, in particular for hearing aids

Title (en)

Tubular body for sound transmission, in particular for hearing aids

Title (de)

Rohrkörper zur Schallübermittlung, insbesondere für ein Hörgerät

Title (fr)

Corps tubulaire de transmission sonore, notamment pour prothèses auditives

Publication

EP 1061772 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118844 A

Priority

  • DE 19528482 A
  • DE 19532548 A
  • DE 19539821 A
  • DE 19544822 A
  • DE 19601535 A
  • EP 96927520 A

Abstract (en)

The hearing aid has a microphone, loudspeaker, battery and other electrical and electronic components. A tubular body (1) leads outwards from between elements in the pars petrosa region and the outer ear (7) through an opening in the outer ear to open into the ear canal (4). The free end of the tubular body (1) can be connected to the sound outlet opening of a device mounted behind the ear. The free end of the tubular body carries the microphone and loudspeaker. The end of the tube carrying the microphone is extended to the upper section of the outer ear and opens to the front.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Rohrkörper zur Schallübermittlung mit einem nach außen zwischen Schläfenbein im Bereich Pars petrosa und Ohrmuschel mit seinem freien Ende einenendes und durch eine Öffnung im äußeren Ohr führenden, gehörgangseitig im Gehörgang anderenendes mündenden Rohrkörper, der am gehörgangseitigen Ende das Trommelfell beschallt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 25/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2013.01); H04R 2225/021 (2013.01); H04R 2225/67 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9706651 A1 19970220; AT 327648 T 20060615; AT 356524 T 20070315; CA 2228372 A1 19970220; CA 2228372 C 20061010; DE 59611350 D1 20060629; DE 59611421 D1 20070419; DK 0842590 T3 20060731; DK 1061772 T3 20070611; EP 0842590 A1 19980520; EP 0842590 B1 20060524; EP 1061772 A2 20001220; EP 1061772 A3 20030129; EP 1061772 B1 20070307; ES 2265152 T3 20070201; ES 2282072 T3 20071016; JP H11510345 A 19990907; PL 188631 B1 20050331; PL 324864 A1 19980622; US 6094493 A 20000725

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090720

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090719

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090720

2010-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090720

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090719

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090719

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090719

2010-03-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-03-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-02-26 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080724

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080723

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080718

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080724

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080807

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080723

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071210

2007-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2282072 T3

2007-06-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-05-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070405

2007-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUNPAT BRAUN EDER AG

2007-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59611421 P 20070419

2007-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-03-07 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0842590 P

2007-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2007-03-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040615

2003-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-12-20 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 842590

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE