Global patent index - EP 1061776 A1

EP 1061776 A1 2000-12-20 - Heating device specially made for heating air

Title (en)

Heating device specially made for heating air

Title (de)

Heizvorrichtung zur Lufterwärmung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de chauffage destiné au réchauffement de l'air

Publication

EP 1061776 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99111605 A

Priority

EP 99111605 A

Abstract (en)

The heating unit for air heating comprises at least one radiator element and at least one positioning frame (10) which is clipped to the radiator element and is provided with means (12) for accommodating at least one PTC heating element. Also claimed are: a) a radiator unit comprisiong a radiator element and a positioning frame; b) a postioning frame with means for acccommodating at least one PTC heating element, and means (16, 18) at least on one side for clipping to a radiator element; c) a method for installation of such a heating unit.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Heizvorrichtung zur Lufterwärmung sowie Radiatorbaugruppen und Positionsrahmen und betrifft ferner ein Verfahren zum Montieren einer erfindungsgemäßen Heizvorrichtung. Die Positionsrahmen weisen Mittel zum schnappbar rastenden Anklinken von Radiatorelementen und Elektrodenblechen auf und ermöglichen so die einfache Zusammenfügung zu Radiatorbaugruppen, die anschließend auf einfache Weise geschichtet bzw. gestapelt werden können. Hierdurch wird eine Heizvorrichtung geschaffen, die verbesserte Montageeigenschaften besitzt. Als Heizelemente werden PTC-Elemente verwendet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/14; H05B 3/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/14 (2006.01); H05B 3/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 3/0429 (2013.01); F24H 9/1872 (2013.01); H05B 3/14 (2013.01); H05B 3/50 (2013.01); H05B 2203/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061776 A1 20001220; EP 1061776 B1 20050105; DE 59911409 D1 20050210; ES 2236991 T3 20050716; US 6472645 B1 20021029

INPADOC legal status

2016-11-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59911409

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: WINTER, BRANDL, FUERNISS, HUEBNER, ROESS, KAIS, DE

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160607

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-09-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DBK DAVID + BAADER GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59911409

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130807

2013-09-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59911409

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: WINTER, BRANDL, FUERNISS, HUEBNER, ROESS, KAIS, DE

- Effective date: 20130807

2013-08-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59911409

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: WINTER, BRANDL, FUERNISS, HUEBNER, ROESS, KAIS, DE

2006-01-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-12-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051006

2005-12-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2236991

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59911409

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-02-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-01-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050105

2005-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-01-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031204

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010508

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI