Global Patent Index - EP 1061798 A1

EP 1061798 A1 2000-12-27 - NON-HUMAN TRANSGENIC MAMMAL, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME AND ITS USE

Title (en)

NON-HUMAN TRANSGENIC MAMMAL, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME AND ITS USE

Title (de)

NICHT-MENSCHLICHES TRANSGENISCHES SÄUGETIER, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

MAMMIFERE TRANSGENIQUE NON HUMAIN, PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE LE PREPARER ET UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1061798 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99922034 A

Priority

  • DE 9900747 W
  • DE 19815958 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19815958C1] A non-human mammal comprises glucocorticoid receptor with altered function in its induced state.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01K 67/027

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/027 (2006.01); C07K 14/72 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/85 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/8509 (2013.01); A01K 67/0275 (2013.01); C07K 14/721 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); A01K 2227/105 (2013.01); A01K 2267/03 (2013.01); C12N 2800/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9945767A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19815958 C1 19990916; AU 3924999 A 19990927; EP 1061798 A1 20001227; JP 2002505858 A 20020226; WO 9945767 A1 19990916

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-07-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050520

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REICHARDT, HOLGER

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHUETZ, GUENTHER

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAESTNER, KLAUS

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HERRLICH, PETER

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ANGEL, PETER

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TUCKERMANN, JAN

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REICHARDT, HOLGER

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHUETZ, GUENTHER

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAESTNER, KLAUS

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HERRLICH, PETER

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ANGEL, PETER

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TUCKERMANN, JAN

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000916

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE