Global Patent Index - EP 1061865 A1

EP 1061865 A1 2000-12-27 - LENS PROTECTOR FOR INTRAOCULAR LENS INSERTER

Title (en)

LENS PROTECTOR FOR INTRAOCULAR LENS INSERTER

Title (de)

LINSENSCHUTZ FÜR EIN INTRAOKULARLINSENEINSETZWERKZEUG

Title (fr)

PROTECTEUR DE LENTILLE POUR DISPOSITIF D'INSERTION DE LENTILLE INTRA-OCULAIRE

Publication

EP 1061865 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99909556 A

Priority

US 9903877 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0049975A1] An apparatus for inserting an intraocular lens through an incision into an eye includes a tube defining a hollow passage, an injector rod longitudinally moveable within the hollow passage and a force transfer assembly coupled to the injector rod. The injector rod has a distal portion adapted to contact the intraocular lens within the hollow passage of the tube to urge the intraocular lens distally through the hollow passage. The force transfer assembly is adapted to transfer sufficient force to the injector rod to effect the longitudinal movement of the injector rod and is further adapted to prevent the transfer of sufficient force to the injector rod to effect the longitudinal movement of the injector rod in response to an increased amount of force being applied to the force transfer assembly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 2/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 9/007 (2006.01); A61F 2/16 (2006.01); A61M 5/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/1664 (2013.01); A61M 5/488 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0049975A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0049975 A1 20000831; EP 1061865 A1 20001227; JP 2003504094 A 20030204

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050721

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040204

2002-09-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ADVANCED MEDICAL OPTICS, INC.

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010119

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL SE