Global Patent Index - EP 1061919 A4

EP 1061919 A4 2002-09-04 - NOVEL OPIATE COMPOUNDS, METHODS OF MAKING AND METHODS OF USE

Title (en)

NOVEL OPIATE COMPOUNDS, METHODS OF MAKING AND METHODS OF USE

Title (de)

NEUE OPIATE, VERFAHREN ZUR IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON

Title (fr)

NOUVEAUX COMPOSES OPIACES ET LEURS PROCEDES DE PREPARATION ET D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1061919 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99912345 A

Priority

  • US 9905131 W
  • US 7740298 P
  • US 10790298 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9945925A1] The present invention relates to a class of nitrogen-containing heterocyclic compounds which bind to opioid receptors. The inventive compounds can be used to treat a variety of disease states which involve the opioid receptors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 211/22; A61K 31/435; A61K 31/445; C07D 211/58; C07D 221/08; C07D 221/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/435 (2006.01); A61K 31/445 (2006.01); A61K 31/4468 (2006.01); A61K 31/451 (2006.01); A61P 25/04 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 211/22 (2006.01); C07D 211/58 (2006.01); C07D 221/08 (2006.01); C07D 221/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 221/22 (2013.01); C07D 211/22 (2013.01); C07D 211/58 (2013.01); C07D 221/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5270328 A 19931214 - CANTRELL BUDDY E [US], et al
  • [A] US 5319087 A 19940607 - ZIMMERMAN DENNIS M [US], et al
  • [Y] EP 0018077 A2 19801029 - LILLY CO ELI [US]
  • [E] WO 9933806 A1 19990708 - ORTHO MCNEIL PHARM INC [US], et al
  • [A] US 5214148 A 19930525 - FELDMAN PAUL L [US], et al
  • [AX] FROIMOWITZ M. ET AL.: "Phenylmorphans and Analogues: Opioid Receptor Subtype Selectivity and Effect of Conformation on Activity", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 35, no. 9, 1992, pages 1521 - 1525, XP002203667
  • [Y] BERTHA, C. M. ET AL.: "Probes for arcotic Receptor-Mediated Phenomena. 20. Alteration of Opioid Receptor Subtype Selectivity of the 5-(3-Hydroxyphenyl)morphans by Application of the Message-Address Concept: Preparation of .delta.-Opioid Receptor Ligands", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 38, no. 9, 1995, pages 1523 - 1537, XP002203668
  • [Y] BERTHA, C. M. ET AL.: "A Marked Change of Receptor Affinity of the 2-Methyl-5-(3-hydroxyphenyl)morphans upon Attachment of an (E)-8-Benzylidene Moiety: Synthesis and Evaluation of a New Class of .sigma. Receptor Ligands", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 37, no. 19, 1994, pages 3163 - 3170, XP002203669
  • [Y] ONG, H. H. ET AL.: "Phenylmorphan Agonists-Antagonists", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 17, no. 1, 1974, pages 133 - 134, XP002203670
  • [PX] THOMAS J B ET AL: "A Stereoselective Synthetic Approach to N-Alkyl-4beta-methyl-5-phenyl morphans", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 40, no. 3, 15 January 1999 (1999-01-15), pages 403 - 406, XP004151342, ISSN: 0040-4039
  • [PX] THOMAS, J. B. ET AL.: "N-substituted 9.beta.-Methyl-5-(3-hydroxyphenyl)morphans Are Opioid Receptor Pure Antagonists", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 41, no. 21, 1998, pages 4143 - 4149, XP002203671
  • [A] CALDERON, S. N.: "Probes for Narcotic receptor Mediated Phenomena. 19. Synthesis of (1)-4-[(.alpha.R)-.alpha.((2S,5R)-4-Allyl-2,5-dimethyl-1-piperazinyl)-3-methoxybenzyl]-N,N-diethylbenzamide (SNC 80): A Highly Selective, Nonpeptide .delta. Opioid Receptor Agonist", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 37, no. 14, 1994, pages 2125 - 2128, XP002203672
  • [T] THOMAS J B ET AL: "Optically Pure (-)-4-[(N-Allyl-3-Methyl-4-Piperidinyl)Phenylamino]-N, N-Diethylbenzamide Displays Selective Binding and Full Agonist Activity for the delta Opioid Receptor", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 9, no. 23, 6 December 1999 (1999-12-06), pages 3347 - 3350, XP004183736, ISSN: 0960-894X
  • See also references of WO 9945925A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9945925 A1 19990916; AT 522503 T 20110915; AU 3073899 A 19990927; AU 756983 B2 20030130; CA 2324418 A1 19990916; CA 2324418 C 20100202; CA 2683097 A1 19990916; EP 1061919 A1 20001227; EP 1061919 A4 20020904; EP 1512683 A1 20050309; EP 1512683 B1 20110831; JP 2002506032 A 20020226; JP 2010095542 A 20100430; JP 2010095543 A 20100430; JP 2010143940 A 20100701; JP 4498602 B2 20100707

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-24 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021111

2002-09-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020718

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07D 211/22 A, 7A 61K 31/435 B, 7C 07D 221/22 B, 7C 07D 211/58 B, 7A 61K 31/445 B, 7C 07D 221/08 B

2001-01-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RESEARCH TRIANGLE INSTITUTE

2001-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CARROL; FRANK, IVY

2001-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MASCARELLA, S., WAYNE

2001-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: THOMAS, JAMES, B

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000911

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE