Global Patent Index - EP 1061971 A1

EP 1061971 A1 2000-12-27 - Apparatus for dialysis with blood-warmer

Title (en)

Apparatus for dialysis with blood-warmer

Title (de)

Gerät für Dialyse mit Erwärmung vom Blut

Title (fr)

Appareil pour la dialyse avec chauffage du sang

Publication

EP 1061971 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00904283 A

Priority

  • US 0000625 W
  • US 11558399 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0041746A1] An integrated CRRT method and apparatus (10) incorporates steps and means for compensating for heat loss from blood in an extracorporeal circuit. A blood warmer (20) is designed to engage and hold a disposable blood tube segment to transfer heat at a closely controlled temperature to blood flowing in the disposable blood tube segment. Another significant aspect of the present invention is a blood tube segment for engagement with the blood warmer (20) is located in downstream of a dialyzer and upstream of a venous pressure monitor (15), an air bubble detector (90) and a venous line clamp (95). The disposable blood tube segment may be selectively connected when heat loss compensation is required and left disconnected when heat loss compensation is not required.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 1/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 1/14 (2006.01); A61M 1/34 (2006.01); A61M 1/36 (2006.01); A61M 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 1/3621 (2013.01); A61M 1/369 (2013.01); A61M 1/16 (2013.01); A61M 1/3627 (2013.01); A61M 1/3639 (2013.01); A61M 2209/082 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0041746A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0041746 A1 20000720; AT 451131 T 20091215; CA 2322947 A1 20000720; CA 2322947 C 20081028; DE 60043476 D1 20100121; EP 1061971 A1 20001227; EP 1061971 B1 20091209; ES 2337760 T3 20100429; JP 2002534223 A 20021015; JP 4463426 B2 20100519; US 2002058896 A1 20020516; US 6349170 B1 20020219; US 6629946 B2 20031007

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170117

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170103

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-03 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100111

2011-08-24 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: GAMBRO INDUSTRIES

- Effective date: 20110811

2011-07-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GAMBRO RENAL PRODUCTS, INC., US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GAMBRO INDUSTRIES S.A.S., GAMBRO RENAL PRODUCTS, INC., , US

- Document: DE 60043476

- Effective date: 20110513

2011-07-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GAMBRO INDUSTRIES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GAMBRO INDUSTRIES S.A.S., GAMBRO RENAL PRODUCTS, INC., , US

- Document: DE 60043476

- Effective date: 20110513

2011-07-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GAMBRO RENAL PRODUCTS, INC., LAKEWOOD, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: GAMBRO INDUSTRIES S.A.S., MEYZIEU, FR; GAMBRO RENAL PRODUCTS, INC., LAKEWOOD, COL., US

- Document: DE 60043476

- Effective date: 20110513

2011-07-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GAMBRO INDUSTRIES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: GAMBRO INDUSTRIES S.A.S., MEYZIEU, FR; GAMBRO RENAL PRODUCTS, INC., LAKEWOOD, COL., US

- Document: DE 60043476

- Effective date: 20110513

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091209

2011-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100111

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091209

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100310

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20100908

2010-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091209

2010-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091209

2010-07-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100409

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091209

2010-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091209

2010-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091209

2010-04-29 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2337760 T3

2010-04-14 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20091209

2010-01-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60043476 P 20100121

2010-01-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2009-12-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-07-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPARATUS FOR DIALYSIS WITH BLOOD-WARMER

2007-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051107

2007-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GAMBRO RENAL PRODUCTS, INC.

2007-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GAMBRO INDUSTRIES SAS

2005-11-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GAMBRO, INC.,

2005-11-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GAMBRO INDUSTRIES SAS

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000828

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE