Global Patent Index - EP 1061973 A1

EP 1061973 A1 2000-12-27 - HEMOSTASIS VALVE ASSEMBLY INCLUDING GUIDE WIRE SEAL

Title (en)

HEMOSTASIS VALVE ASSEMBLY INCLUDING GUIDE WIRE SEAL

Title (de)

HÄMOSTATISCHE VENTILANORDNUNG MIT EINER DICHTUNG FÜR DEN FÜHRUNGSDRAHT

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE VALVE HEMOSTATIQUE A PASSAGE DE FIL-GUIDE ETANCHE

Publication

EP 1061973 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99909934 A

Priority

  • US 9905121 W
  • US 3849698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9945983A1] A hemostasis valve assembly (12) adapted for use within a catheter introducer (10) is disclosed. The valve assembly (12) includes first (30), second (32) and third (34) sealing members wherein the second sealing member (32) comprises a guide wire seal. The guide wire seal includes a plurality of lip members (74) defining a pair of perpendicularly disposed slits (76) and an aperture (84) intersecting at least one of the slits (76). The aperture (84) is adapted to sealingly engage a small diameter guide wire (26) for preventing fluid flow out of the catheter introducer (10) through the valve assembly while the slits (76) allow for the passage of a large diameter elongated member or loader (24). Two pairs of diametrically opposed pre-load ribs (86, 88) extend radially towards the aperture (84) for pressing the lip members (74) together in sealing engagement. A substantially spherical inner surface is provided for guiding the guide wire (26) to the aperture (84).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 5/00; A61M 5/178

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 25/01 (2006.01); A61M 39/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 39/0606 (2013.01); A61M 2039/062 (2013.01); A61M 2039/0633 (2013.01); A61M 2039/0653 (2013.01); A61M 2039/066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9945983 A1 19990916; CA 2327657 A1 19990916; EP 1061973 A1 20001227; EP 1061973 A4 20030102; JP 2002505920 A 20020226

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041204

2004-04-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES CORPORATION

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030624

2003-01-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021115

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61M 39/06 A

2001-03-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ATKINSON, GORDON, E.

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL