Global Patent Index - EP 1061980 A1

EP 1061980 A1 2000-12-27 - METABOLIC GAS EXCHANGE AND NONINVASIVE CARDIAC OUTPUT MONITOR

Title (en)

METABOLIC GAS EXCHANGE AND NONINVASIVE CARDIAC OUTPUT MONITOR

Title (de)

NICHTINVASIVES GERÄT ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VON METABOLISCHEM GASAUSTAUSCH UND HERZAUSSCHÜTTUNG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE SURVEILLANCE NON EFFRACTIVE D'ECHANGE DE GAZ METABOLIQUES ET DU DEBIT CARDIAQUE

Publication

EP 1061980 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98911713 A

Priority

US 9805184 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 16/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/08 (2006.01); A61B 5/029 (2006.01); A61B 5/083 (2006.01); A61B 5/087 (2006.01); A61M 16/00 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061980 A1 20001227; EP 1061980 A4 20020925; JP 2002505923 A 20020226

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040416

2003-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEALTHETECH, INC.

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MAULT, JAMES R.

2002-09-25 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61B 5/083 A, 7A 61B 5/029 B

2001-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61M 15/00 A

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE