Global Patent Index - EP 1061980 A4

EP 1061980 A4 2002-09-25 - METABOLIC GAS EXCHANGE AND NONINVASIVE CARDIAC OUTPUT MONITOR

Title (en)

METABOLIC GAS EXCHANGE AND NONINVASIVE CARDIAC OUTPUT MONITOR

Title (de)

NICHTINVASIVES GERÄT ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VON METABOLISCHEM GASAUSTAUSCH UND HERZAUSSCHÜTTUNG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE SURVEILLANCE NON EFFRACTIVE D'ECHANGE DE GAZ METABOLIQUES ET DU DEBIT CARDIAQUE

Publication

EP 1061980 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98911713 A

Priority

US 9805184 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 5/083; A61B 5/029

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/08 (2006.01); A61B 5/029 (2006.01); A61B 5/083 (2006.01); A61B 5/087 (2006.01); A61M 16/00 (2006.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DA] US 5179958 A 19930119 - MAULT JAMES R [US]
  • [DA] CAPEK J M ET AL: "NONINVASIVE MEASUREMENT OF CARDIAC OUTPUT USING PARTIAL CO2 REBREATHING", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, vol. 35, no. 9, 1 September 1988 (1988-09-01), pages 653 - 661, XP000209300, ISSN: 0018-9294
  • See also references of WO 9945988A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1061980 A1 20001227; EP 1061980 A4 20020925; JP 2002505923 A 20020226

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040416

2003-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEALTHETECH, INC.

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAULT, JAMES R.

2002-09-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61B 5/083 A, 7A 61B 5/029 B

2001-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61M 15/00 A

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE