Global Patent Index - EP 1062005 A1

EP 1062005 A1 2000-12-27 - INERTING METHOD FOR PREVENTING AND EXTINGUISHING FIRES IN ENCLOSED SPACES

Title (en)

INERTING METHOD FOR PREVENTING AND EXTINGUISHING FIRES IN ENCLOSED SPACES

Title (de)

INERTISIERUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR BRANDVERHÜTUNG UND -LÖSCHUNG IN GESCHLOSSENEN RÄUMEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'INERTISATION POUR LA PREVENTION ET L'EXTINCTION DES INCENDIES DANS DES LOCAUX FERMES

Publication

EP 1062005 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907555 A

Priority

  • DE 19811851 A
  • EP 9901021 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19811851A1] A nitrogen generator (as opposed to bottled gas) is used to reduce the oxygen concentration from the normal 21% to about 16% so that the room could still be visited safely. In case of fire this concentration is lowered to about 12% by using bottled gas and at this level combustion cannot be sustained. Oxygen concentration is monitored by instruments incorporated in an aspirating type of fire detector/alarm so that the operation of this system is automatic. T here can be provision to lower the oxygen concentration at night, when it is unlikely that the room need be visited, from the stated 16% by using the nitrogen generator.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 2/00 (2006.01); A62C 2/04 (2006.01); A62C 99/00 (2010.01); B01J 19/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 99/0018 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • WO 9513044 A1 19950518 - AGA AB [SE], et al
  • WO 9703631 A1 19970206 - HYPOXICO INC [US]
  • US 4807706 A 19890228 - LAMBERTSEN CHRISTIAN J [US], et al
  • "INERGEN - No other halon 1301 replacement has so many approvals, in so many countries", FIRE INTERNATIONAL, vol. 144, August 1994 (1994-08-01) - September 1994 (1994-09-01), XP002907509
  • See also references of WO 9947210A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19811851 A1 19990923; DE 19811851 C2 20010104; AT 248626 T 20030915; AU 2725899 A 19991011; AU 747436 B2 20020516; CA 2301628 A1 19990923; CA 2301628 C 20060815; CZ 20000127 A3 20000614; CZ 297177 B6 20060913; DK 1062005 T3 20040105; DK 1062005 T4 20070806; EP 1062005 A1 20001227; EP 1062005 B1 20030903; EP 1062005 B2 20070328; EP 1062005 B3 20130724; ES 2193902 T1 20031116; ES 2193902 T3 20110401; ES 2193902 T5 20120228; ES 2193902 T7 20131223; NO 20000791 A 20000217; NO 20000791 D0 20000217; NO 329215 B1 20100913; PL 188349 B1 20050131; PL 338246 A1 20001009; RU 2212262 C2 20030920; UA 67746 C2 20001115; WO 9947210 A1 19990923

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: DUFOURSTRASSE 116, 8008 ZUERICH (CH)

2017-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-02 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20130402167

- Effective date: 20160905

2017-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160217

2017-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-12-12 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-11-30 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160218

2016-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160905

2016-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160217

2016-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20151008

2015-10-08 [REG DE R042] PATENT'S REVOCATION IN FULL NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59906865

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20150212

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150211

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-14 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20130402167

- Effective date: 20131118

2013-11-05 [REG SE REB3] PATENT HAS BEEN RESTRICTED BY THE EPO

- Effective date: 20130724

2013-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20030903

2013-09-25 [REG NL VD3] ANNULMENT

- Effective date: 20130918

2013-08-22 [REG DE R039] REVOCATION ACTION FILED

- Document: DE 59906865

- Effective date: 20130522

2013-07-31 [REG CH AELM] LIMITATION AGREED

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-05-22 [REG DE R008] CASE PENDING AT FEDERAL PATENT COURT

- Document: DE 59906865

2013-05-16 [REG DE R056] PATENT LIMITED BY EPO AT PATENTEE'S REQUEST

- Document: DE 59906865

- Effective date: 20130222

2012-12-26 [LIM1] LIMITATION IS ADMISSIBLE

- Free text: SEQUENCE NO: 1; FILED AFTER OPPOSITION PERIOD

- Filing date: 20121108

2012-11-08 [REG DE R055] PATENTEE'S LIMITATION REQUEST RECEIVED BY EPO

- Document: DE 59906865

2012-07-18 [REG NL VD3] ANNULMENT

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-06-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: WAGNER GROUP GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 248626 T

- Effective date: 20120418

2012-03-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: WAGNER GROUP G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20120328

2012-03-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: WAGNER GROUP GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20120216

2012-03-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: WAGNER GROUP GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20120216

2012-02-29 [REG CH PFUS] MERGER

- Owner name: WAGNER GROUP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WAGNER ALARM- UND SICHERUNGSSYSTEME GMBH, DE

2012-02-28 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Document: ES 2193902 T5

- Effective date: 20120228

2011-12-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20111201 AND 20111207

2011-12-28 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20111221

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2193902 T3

- Effective date: 20110401

2007-10-26 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2007-08-06 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

2007-08-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2007-07-23 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20070401963

2007-07-03 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2007-06-20 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2007-06-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20070328

2007-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040218

2007-04-30 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2007-03-28 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20070328

2007-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2004-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: MINIMAX GMBH

2004-07-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MINIMAX GMBH

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-02-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-02-03 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-01-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-01-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-12-22 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030404595

2003-10-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906865 P 20031009

2003-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FELBER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-09-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WAGNER, ERNST, WERNER

2002-02-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHUETTE, VOLKER DR.

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010817

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991214

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE