Global Patent Index - EP 1062048 A1

EP 1062048 A1 2000-12-27 - METHOD FOR MODIFYING THE SWIRL MOTION OF A LIQUID IN A SWIRL CHAMBER OF A NOZZLE AND SWIRL GENERATOR FOR NOZZLES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MODIFYING THE SWIRL MOTION OF A LIQUID IN A SWIRL CHAMBER OF A NOZZLE AND SWIRL GENERATOR FOR NOZZLES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM VERÄNDERN DER DRALLBEWEGUNG EINES FLUIDS IN DER DRALLKAMMER EINER DÜSE UND DRALLERZEUGER FÜR DÜSEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE MODIFIER LE MOUVEMENT DE ROTATION D'UN FLUIDE DANS LA CHAMBRE DE ROTATION D'UN GICLEUR ET GENERATEUR DE ROTATION POUR GICLEURS

Publication

EP 1062048 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99916822 A

Priority

  • DE 19811736 A
  • EP 9901726 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19811736A1] The vortex creator has a vortex chamber containing a vortex jet with several supply channels (4a-4d). At least two of these channels oaf different cross-section surfaces, being of the same height but of different widths. The fluid throughput is divided into several part flows, divided among the channels. If high vortex strength is required for a fine droplet spectrum, the part flow through the narrow channel is increased, and vice versa/

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 1/34; F23D 11/26; F23D 11/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/26 (2006.01); B05B 1/34 (2006.01); F23D 11/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/3468 (2013.01); B05B 1/3436 (2013.01); B05B 1/3478 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947270A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19811736 A1 19990923; AT 202502 T 20010715; AU 3517599 A 19991011; AU 753492 B2 20021017; BR 9908844 A 20001128; CA 2322565 A1 19990923; DK 1062048 T3 20010924; EP 1062048 A1 20001227; EP 1062048 B1 20010627; ES 2161095 T3 20011116; ES 2161095 T4 20020516; JP 2002506723 A 20020305; NO 20004507 A 20001114; NO 20004507 D0 20000908; NZ 506355 A 20020628; PL 342812 A1 20010702; PT 1062048 E 20011228; TR 200002408 T2 20010122; US 6517012 B1 20030211; WO 9947270 A1 19990923

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170330

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170330

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160317

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160317

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-24 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140318

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900139

- Representative's name: WEIDNER STERN JESCHKE PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSC, DE

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130320

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SLOWIK GUNTER

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KOHLMANN JURGEN

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080317

2008-08-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080321

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070323

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-11-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-03-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040318

2004-03-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040317

2003-12-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-03-25 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030325

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030324

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030317

2002-06-26 [REG GB 711B] APPLICATION MADE FOR CORRECTION OF ERROR (SECT. 117/77)

2002-06-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-15 [REG GB 711B] APPLICATION MADE FOR CORRECTION OF ERROR (SECT. 117/77)

2002-03-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-25 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020325

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-03-17 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020317

2002-02-26 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20020226

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-12-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2161095 T3

2001-11-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-09-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2001-09-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-09-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-09-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900139 20010802

2001-07-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-06-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010627

2001-06-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 202502 T 20010715

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010220

2001-03-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR MODIFYING THE SWIRL MOTION OF A LIQUID IN A SWIRL CHAMBER OF A NOZZLE AND NOZZLE SYSTEM

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE