Global patent index - EP 1062049 A1

EP 1062049 A1 2000-12-27 - TANK-CLEANING DEVICE

Title (en)

TANK-CLEANING DEVICE

Title (de)

TANKREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE DE RESERVOIR

Publication

EP 1062049 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99910236 A

Priority

  • DE 19811421 A
  • EP 9901063 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19811421A1] The cleaning device has a housing that is inserted in the tank opening and having a fluid supply pipe and a nozzle holder (4) with four nozzles (8,9,10,11). Each pair of nozzles are set V-fashion at an acute angle (12) to each other with the two V-formations (13,14) pointing in opposite directions (15). The rotation of the nozzle holder about its first rotary axis and the nozzle assembly (6) about the second rotary axis (7) are mechanically linked at a fixed ratio to ensure repeat spray patterns.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 3/04; B08B 9/093

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 3/04 (2006.01); B08B 9/093 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 3/0445 (2013.01); B08B 9/0936 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947271A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19811421 A1 19990923; DE 19811421 C2 20010913; DK 1062049 T3 20040601; EP 1062049 A1 20001227; EP 1062049 B1 20040421; US 6460553 B1 20021008; WO 9947271 A1 19990923

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110219

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110218

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2012-01-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59909241

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110218

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110218

2011-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-10-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100226

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100202

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100218

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100211

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091218

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909241

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT SE

2004-04-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000811

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT SE