Global Patent Index - EP 1062050 A1

EP 1062050 A1 2000-12-27 - MASKING MATERIALS AND METHOD OF USE

Title (en)

MASKING MATERIALS AND METHOD OF USE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM ABDECKEN

Title (fr)

MATERIAUX DE MASQUAGE ET TECHNIQUE D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1062050 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99909921 A

Priority

  • GB 9804967 A
  • US 9905053 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9946056A1] A masking material comprises an elongate strip (8) at least partially coated with a layer of a pressure-sensitive adhesive (4), the strip having a curved surface which is convex when the strip is viewed in cross section and is positioned such that when the strip is adhered to a substrate (12) by the layer of pressure-sensitive adhesive a portion of the curved surface overhangs the substrate. The masking material comprises a removable edge portion (10) comprising said portion of the curved surface detachably secured to a remainder of the strip and which may be removed to expose a second curved surface on the remainder of the strip which is convex when viewed in cross section and which is positioned to overhang the substrate. The removable portion and remainder of the strip have different dimensions. Methods for making such masking material are also described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/04 (2006.01); B05D 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/0468 (2013.01); B05B 15/0456 (2013.01); B05B 15/0462 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9946056A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9946056 A1 19990916; BR 9908640 A 20001114; CA 2322956 A1 19990916; CA 2322956 C 20080520; CN 1106889 C 20030430; CN 1292732 A 20010425; DE 69925465 D1 20050630; DE 69925465 T2 20060511; EP 1062050 A1 20001227; EP 1062050 B1 20050525; ES 2241266 T3 20051016; GB 9804967 D0 19980506; JP 2002505950 A 20020226; JP 4274695 B2 20090610

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160309

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160309

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160309

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69925465

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150304

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150309

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150212

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150305

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-05-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2241266 T3

2005-06-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69925465 P 20050630

2005-05-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-05-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030610

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT