Global patent index - EP 1062053 A1

EP 1062053 A1 2000-12-27 - METHOD FOR POWDER-COATING

Title (en)

METHOD FOR POWDER-COATING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR PULVERLACKIERUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE LAQUAGE PAR POUDRAGE

Publication

EP 1062053 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99911798 A

Priority

  • DE 19811319 A
  • DE 19831781 A
  • EP 9901720 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947276A1] The invention relates to a method for powder-coating a substrate (5), especially temperature-sensitive substrates such as wood, wood-fibre materials, plastic materials, rubber, woven fabric, paper or cardboard. According to said method a heat-sensitive powder is deposited as a base coat (6) on the uncoated surface of the substrate (5). The powder is then either heated continuously to cross-linking temperature by means of infrared radiation having at least fractions in the near and/or short-wave infrared range, and hardened; alternatively, the powder is continuously heated to gelling temperature, cross-linking is completed in a subsequent step and the powder is then hardened. To generate the infrared radiation the invention provides for the use of halogen lamps (7) in combination with a reflector (8) for reflecting the radiation emitted in the direction of the substrate. The halogen lamps (7) are operated in such a way that a maximum radiation flux density of the emitted radiation is in the near infrared region.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 3/02 (2006.01); B05D 7/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 3/0263 (2013.01); B05D 2401/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947276A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9947276 A1 19990923; AU 3035299 A 19991011; BR 9908843 A 20001121; CA 2324097 A1 19990923; CN 1203924 C 20050601; CN 1293598 A 20010502; EP 1062053 A1 20001227; EP 1062053 B1 20020814; ES 2182500 T3 20030301; JP 2002506725 A 20020305; US 6436485 B1 20020820

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060323

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-24 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20060224

2006-05-24 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20060224

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-15 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: HERAEUS NOBLELIGHT GMBH

- Effective date: 20030509

2005-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050530

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050413

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050318

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050307

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: HERAEUS NOBLELIGHT GMBH

- Effective date: 20030509

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2182500

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-10-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59902341

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-19

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-08-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010208

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT