Global patent index - EP 1062055 A1

EP 1062055 A1 2000-12-27 - COLLAPSIBLE ANNULAR ACOUSTIC TRANSMISSION ANTENNA

Title (en)

COLLAPSIBLE ANNULAR ACOUSTIC TRANSMISSION ANTENNA

Title (de)

DEMONTIERBARE RINGFÖRMIGE AKUSTISCHE SENDEANTENNE

Title (fr)

ANTENNE D'EMISSION ACOUSTIQUE ANNULAIRE DEMONTABLE

Publication

EP 1062055 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99907670 A

Priority

  • FR 9900523 W
  • FR 9802912 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2776161A1] The assembly has ring stacks piezoelectric elements segments formed with inner fixing sections or outer constraining hoops. The construction does not need a common construction structure to hold the transducers which would otherwise add weight.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B06B 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/06 (2006.01); G01S 7/521 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/0633 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9946059A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2776161 A1 19990917; FR 2776161 B1 20000526; AU 2732399 A 19990927; AU 747667 B2 20020516; DE 69917235 D1 20040617; DE 69917235 T2 20050504; EP 1062055 A1 20001227; EP 1062055 B1 20040512; JP 2002505953 A 20020226; JP 4031198 B2 20080109; US 6345014 B1 20020205; WO 9946059 A1 19990916

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-09-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040816

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69917235

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020108

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT