Global patent index - EP 1062062 A1

EP 1062062 A1 2000-12-27 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR STRAIGHTENING WIRE

Title (en)

PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR STRAIGHTENING WIRE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM DRAHTRICHTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR REDRESSER UN FIL

Publication

EP 1062062 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99910322 A

Priority

  • DE 19811209 A
  • EP 9901380 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9946066A1] In a process for straightening wire, a wire (1) coming from a first reel (2) is drawn through a straightening unit (3) with straightening rolls. The straightening unit (3) rotates about a first axis (A-A) which is defined by the longitudinal direction of the path of the wire in the region of the straightening unit (3). After emerging from the straightening unit (3), the wire (1) is wound onto a second reel (4), the diameter of which is greater than that of the first reel (2). The second reel (4) is rotated in accordance with the direction of rotation of the straightening unit (3) about a second axis (C) which is defined by the path of the wire leading tangentially onto the second reel (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 3/06; B21F 1/00; B21F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 3/06 (2006.01); B21F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 3/06 (2013.01); B21F 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9946066A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9946066 A1 19990916; DE 19811209 A1 19991118; DE 19811209 C2 20000224; EP 1062062 A1 20001227; EP 1062062 B1 20020717

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-12-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2003-07-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030422

2002-12-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB

2002-07-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011113

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000711

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB