Global Patent Index - EP 1062066 A2

EP 1062066 A2 2000-12-27 - METHOD FOR ADJUSTING A CONTINUOUS CASTING INSTALLATION ROLL SEGMENT

Title (en)

METHOD FOR ADJUSTING A CONTINUOUS CASTING INSTALLATION ROLL SEGMENT

Title (de)

ANSTELLVERFAHREN FÜR EIN ROLLENSEGMENT EINER STRANGGIESSANLAGE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REGLAGE D'UN SEGMENT DE ROULEAUX D'UNE INSTALLATION DE COULEE CONTINUE

Publication

EP 1062066 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99910282 A

Priority

  • DE 19809807 A
  • EP 9901222 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19809807A1] The hydraulic cylinder units (8, 9, 10, 11) are governed by position and pressure control. Rolls (3) are positioned against a cast slab (5) - to be guided by these rolls - using the hydraulic cylinder units operating under position control. Position control of these cylinder units is replaced by pressure control, if the pressure in respective cylinder unit exceeds a limit specified for it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/20 (2006.01); B22D 11/128 (2006.01); B22D 11/16 (2006.01); B21B 37/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/208 (2013.01); B22D 11/128 (2013.01); B21B 37/62 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9946071A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19809807 A1 19990916; DE 19809807 C2 20030327; AT 216931 T 20020515; BR 9908593 A 20040629; CA 2323410 A1 19990916; CA 2323410 C 20070626; CN 1097494 C 20030101; CN 1291927 A 20010418; EP 1062066 A2 20001227; EP 1062066 B1 20020502; ES 2177259 T3 20021201; ID 23321 A 20000405; JP 2002505958 A 20020226; JP 4354638 B2 20091028; MX PA00008838 A 20020621; RU 2213643 C2 20031010; TR 200002621 T2 20001121; TW 380066 B 20000121; UA 61132 C2 20001215; US 6386268 B1 20020514; WO 9946071 A2 19990916; WO 9946071 A3 19991111

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SMS SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 40237 DUESSELDORF, DE

- Document: DE 59901349

2015-08-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59901349

- Representative's name: HEMMERICH & KOLLEGEN, DE

2003-04-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030204

2003-02-25 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2177259 T3

2002-08-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020806

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-31 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Free text: WEYER, AXEL * SCHMITZ, WOLFGANG * HARTMANN, RALF * GEERKENS, CHRISTIAN

2002-06-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901349 20020606

2002-05-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT LU NL

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 216931 T 20020515

2002-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEYER, AXEL

2002-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHMITT, WOLFGANG

2002-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARTMANN, RALF

2002-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GEERKENS, CHRISTIAN

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010924

2001-01-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT LU NL