Global Patent Index - EP 1062072 A1

EP 1062072 A1 2000-12-27 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A HIGH-QUALITY SURFACE, WIDE-WHEEL GRINDING DEVICE AND USE OF SAME

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING A HIGH-QUALITY SURFACE, WIDE-WHEEL GRINDING DEVICE AND USE OF SAME

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ERZEUGEN EINER QUALITATIV ANSPRUCHSVOLLEN OBERFLÄCHE SOWIE BREITSCHLEIFVORRICHTUNG UND DIE VERWENDUNG DERSELBEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UNE SURFACE DE HAUTE QUALITE ET DISPOSITIF DE PON AGE LARGE ET UTILISATION DUDIT DISPOSITIF

Publication

EP 1062072 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99906014 A

Priority

  • CH 9900111 W
  • CH 55498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19852671A1] At least one and preferably two grinding units are slightly offset at a small angle of engagement crosswise to the advance direction (2) of the objects so that a rhomboid pattern is produced virtually in the calibrating or fine grinding stage.- DETAILED DESCRIPTION - Independent claim describes wide wheel grinding device for flat objects, which has two grinding units (3,4) set on the same plate side but slightly offset across advance direction. The contact pressure of the two fine grinding units can be adjusted independently

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 7/28; B24B 7/12; B24B 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 1/00 (2006.01); B24B 7/19 (2006.01); B24B 19/02 (2006.01); B24B 21/00 (2006.01); B24B 21/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 29/005 (2013.01); B24B 1/00 (2013.01); B24B 7/19 (2013.01); B24B 19/028 (2013.01); B24B 21/008 (2013.01); B24B 21/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9946082A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19852671 A1 19990923; AT 231768 T 20030215; AU 2607699 A 19990927; DE 59904158 D1 20030306; EP 1062072 A1 20001227; EP 1062072 B1 20030129; WO 9946082 A1 19990916

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090318

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-07 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20080813

2008-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080211

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080229

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUEHLER AG PATENTABTEILUNG

2004-01-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HANS WEBER MASCHINENFABRIK GMBHPATENTANWAELTE

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-12-19 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-07-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-04-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-03-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALT ERNST ACKERMANN

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904158 P 20030306

2003-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STEINEMANN TECHNOLOGY AG

2002-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020114

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000911

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE