Global Patent Index - EP 1062073 A1

EP 1062073 A1 2000-12-27 - A MACHINE FOR GRINDING SEMI-FINISHED PRODUCTS, PARTICULARLY BILLETS

Title (en)

A MACHINE FOR GRINDING SEMI-FINISHED PRODUCTS, PARTICULARLY BILLETS

Title (de)

MASCHINE ZUM SCHLEIFEN VON HALBZEUG, INSBESONDERE KNÜPPELN

Title (fr)

MACHINE A RECTIFIER DES PRODUITS SEMI-FINIS, EN PARTICULIER, DES BILLETTES

Publication

EP 1062073 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99911742 A

Priority

  • EP 9901437 W
  • IT PD980052 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947305A1] A machine for grinding billets (2) is described and comprises a framework (3) on which the billet (2) being ground is guided along a predetermined axis (B) of movement, and at least one grinding wheel (18, 19) which is mounted on the framework (3) and is rotated about its own axis (M1, M2) as well as being in contact with the billet (2) in order to grind the surface (2a) thereof, the axis (M1, M2) of rotation of the at least one grinding wheel (18, 19) being inclined angularly to an axis (K) transverse the axis (B) of movement of the billet (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 27/033; B24B 7/12; B24D 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 7/12 (2006.01); B24B 27/033 (2006.01); B24D 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 5/06 (2013.01); B24B 7/12 (2013.01); B24B 27/033 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947305A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9947305 A1 19990923; AU 3031799 A 19991011; DE 69900674 D1 20020221; EP 1062073 A1 20001227; EP 1062073 B1 20020116; IT PD980052 A1 19990913

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050305

2004-01-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-01-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-07-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-04-17 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-04-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020416

2002-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020329

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69900674

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-21

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT SE

2002-01-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020116

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010426

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT SE