Global Patent Index - EP 1062111 A1

EP 1062111 A1 2000-12-27 - SUSPENSION LUG FOR A SWINGING LOAD, ESPECIALLY AN EXHAUST SYSTEM OF A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (en)

SUSPENSION LUG FOR A SWINGING LOAD, ESPECIALLY AN EXHAUST SYSTEM OF A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (de)

AUFHÄNGEÖSE FÜR EINE SCHWINGENDE LAST, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE ABGASANLAGE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS

Title (fr)

BOUCLE DE SUSPENSION POUR CHARGE OSCILLANTE, EN PARTICULIER POUR LE SYSTEME D'ECHAPPEMENT D'UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 1062111 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99915647 A

Priority

  • DE 19812347 A
  • EP 9901772 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19812347C1] According to the invention, a ring-shaped elastomer body (10) is delimited by an outer wall (12) and an inner wall (14) and has two diametrically opposed suspension poles (16) and two equatorial zones (18) in a system in which the suspension poles (16) move away from each other when the suspension lug is subjected to a tensile load while the equatorial zones (18) move towards each other. A flexible insert (20) is embedded in the elastomer body (10) in such a way that when the suspension lug is subjected to a tensile load, tensile forces are transmitted from one suspension pole (16) to the other via the equatorial zones (18). The distance of the insert (20) to the inner wall (14) of the elastomer body (10) decreases steadily from the suspension poles (16) towards the equatorial zones (18). As a result, no damaging tensile stress can occur anywhere in the elastomer body (10) when the suspension lug is subjected to tensile load.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60K 13/04; F01N 7/18; F16L 55/033

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 13/04 (2006.01); F01N 13/18 (2010.01); F16F 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/1822 (2013.01); B60K 13/04 (2013.01); F16F 3/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948717A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19812347 C1 19991007; EP 1062111 A1 20001227; EP 1062111 B1 20041215; ES 2233033 T3 20050601; US 6264164 B1 20010724; WO 9948717 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SUEDDEUTSCHE GELENKSCHEIBENFABRIK GESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59911278

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140213

2014-04-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59911278

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: WUESTHOFF & WUESTHOFF PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

- Effective date: 20140213

2014-04-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59911278

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: WUESTHOFF & WUESTHOFF, PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE

- Effective date: 20140213

2005-12-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-12-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2233033

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-03-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050218

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59911278

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-01-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-12-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT