Global patent index - EP 1062135 A2

EP 1062135 A2 2000-12-27 - AUTHORISATION VERIFICATION SYSTEM FOR VEHICLES

Title (en)

AUTHORISATION VERIFICATION SYSTEM FOR VEHICLES

Title (de)

BERECHTIGUNGSKONTROLLSYSTEM FÜR FAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE CONTROLE D'AUTORISATION POUR VEHICULES A MOTEUR

Publication

EP 1062135 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99916790 A

Priority

  • DE 9900701 W
  • DE 19811435 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19811435A1] The invention relates to an authorisation verification system for vehicles, in which a control device (STG) situated in the vehicle and fitted with a portable user transponder (U-TP) in the course of a question-answer dialogue (ZFAD) accompanied by a data exchange monitors and releases or blocks the authorisation to lock or unlock the vehicle doors and to start or drive the vehicle. To be able to modify the identification characteristic of user transponders (U-TP) and vehicle components for security reasons, the invention provides for the system to comprise in addition to one or more user transponders a master transponder which has a special, vehicle-specific identification characteristic and with which in a special question-answer dialogue (SFAD) the authorisation to carry out special functions of a predetermined scale which exceed the authorisation to start or drive the vehicle can be monitored and released or blocked. To carry out said special functions the master transponder comprises acoustic and/or optical display devices (AZ) and/or input devices (EG).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 25/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 25/24 (2013.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01); E05B 85/00 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60R 25/24 (2013.01); G07C 9/00309 (2013.01); G07C 9/00817 (2013.01); E05B 85/01 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00507 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00611 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00769 (2013.01); G07C 2209/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947393A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19811435 A1 19990930; EP 1062135 A2 20001227; EP 1062135 B1 20030827; US 6650224 B1 20031118; WO 9947393 A2 19990923; WO 9947393 A3 19991021

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-09-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-02-25 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030827

2003-12-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-11-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906774

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030827

2003-08-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030827

2003-08-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030827

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE