Global Patent Index - EP 1062173 A1

EP 1062173 A1 2000-12-27 - SPLICING TAPE, SPLICING METHOD AND ASSEMBLY COMPRISING THE SPLICING TAPE

Title (en)

SPLICING TAPE, SPLICING METHOD AND ASSEMBLY COMPRISING THE SPLICING TAPE

Title (de)

VERBINDUNGSSTREIFEN, VERBINDUNGSVERFAHREN UND EINHEIT, DIE DIESEN VERBINDUNGS-STREIFEN BEINHALTET

Title (fr)

RUBAN DE RABOUTAGE, PROCEDE ET ENSEMBLE DE RABOUTAGE COMPRENANT LE RUBAN DE RABOUTAGE

Publication

EP 1062173 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99939185 A

Priority

  • EP 99939185 A
  • EP 98104565 A
  • US 9903058 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0941954A1] Method of splicing a leading edge portion (34) of the outer turn (32) of a roll sheet material (30) to a further sheet comprising the steps of <i) providing a splicing tape (10) comprising a carrier layer (13) having on a first major surface a first adhesive layer (12) and on a second major surface opposite to the first major surface in the order given a non-tacky polymer layer (14) and a second adhesive layer (15), the splicing tape being capable of delamination between the carrier layer (13) and the non-tacky polymer layer (14) when preparing the splice, <ii) positioning said tape on and adhering it by means of one of the adhesive layers (12,15), respectively, to the portion of the upper surface of the next-to-the-outer turn (31) of the roll of sheet material (30) facing the leading edge portion (34) of the outer turn (32) so that the other adhesive layer of the splice tape (10) can be fully or partly adhered to the under-surface of the leading edge portion (34) of the outer turn (32), <iii) adhering the other adhesive layer of the splice tape to the under-surface of the leading edge portion (34) of the outer turn (32) of the roll of sheet material (30), <iv) optionally providing an adhesive tape (39) having a first adhesive surface and a second adhesive surface, and adhering one of the adhesive surfaces, respectively, to the upper surface of the leading edge portion (34) of the outer turn (32) of the roll of sheet material (30), <v) adhering the further sheet to the optionally partially exposed surface of the other adhesive surface of the splicing tape (10) and/or to the exposed surface of the other adhesive layer of said optional adhesive tape (39), and <vi) separating the further sheet and the outer turn of the roll spliced to it, from the next-to-the-outer turn of the roll thereby effecting delamination between the carrier layer (13) and the non-tacky polymer layer (14) of the splicing tape (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/102 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4607 (2013.01); B65H 2301/46078 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9946196A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0941954 A1 19990915; DE 69900817 D1 20020314; DE 69900817 T2 20020829; EP 1062173 A1 20001227; EP 1062173 B1 20020123; JP 2002505989 A 20020226; WO 9946196 A1 19990916

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-12-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69900817

- Effective date: 20120901

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110208

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090211

2009-10-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090211

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090211

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080211

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080212

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-10-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-05-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080227

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070518

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-01-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900817 20020314

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000908

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT SE