Global Patent Index - EP 1062175 A1

EP 1062175 A1 2000-12-27 - LONGITUDINAL CUTTING DEVICE FOR A WINDING MACHINE

Title (en)

LONGITUDINAL CUTTING DEVICE FOR A WINDING MACHINE

Title (de)

LÄNGSSCHNEIDEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE WICKELMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COUPE LONGITUDINALE POUR ENROULEUSE

Publication

EP 1062175 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99904878 A

Priority

  • DE 19809954 A
  • EP 9900928 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19809954A1] Known winding machines for winding up continuous strips of material, especially plastic strips, use longitudinal cutting devices comprising a series of upper blades (1) embodied as disk-shaped circular blades, and a series of lower blades (2) embodied as circular blades. According to the invention one lower blade (2) each is arranged on both sides of an upper blade (1), the lower blades (2) are mounted in a freely rotating manner on a carrying axle (3) and the planes of rotation (4) of the two lower blades (2) assigned to an upper blade (1) are symmetrically inclined in relation to each other and form an acute angle with said plane of rotation (5) of the upper blade (1) in such a way that the cutting edges of the two lower blades (2) move towards and away from each other during one revolution. The longitudinal cutting device provided for in the invention makes it possible to cut narrow ribbons from the strip and to convey them such that the rolls can be wound on a shared winding axle with the required distance between them.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 35/02; B26D 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/24 (2006.01); B26D 7/20 (2006.01); B26D 7/26 (2006.01); B31B 1/18 (2006.01); B65H 35/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/245 (2013.01); B26D 7/20 (2013.01); B26D 7/2621 (2013.01); B65H 35/02 (2013.01); B26D 2007/202 (2013.01); B31B 50/18 (2017.08); Y10T 83/7813 (2015.04); Y10T 83/783 (2015.04); Y10T 83/9464 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19809954 A1 19990909; EP 1062175 A1 20001227; EP 1062175 B1 20020619; ES 2180275 T3 20030201; US 6631663 B1 20031014; WO 9944932 A1 19990910

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090212

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090213

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090212

2010-04-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090213

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090212

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080220

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080223

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2003-06-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030320

2003-02-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2180275 T3

2003-01-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030121

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-07-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901798 20020725

2002-07-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-06-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI SE

2002-06-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-06-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010816

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI SE