Global Patent Index - EP 1062178 A1

EP 1062178 A1 2000-12-27 - IMPACT DRIVEN HOIST

Title (en)

IMPACT DRIVEN HOIST

Title (de)

SCHLAGARTIG ANGETRIEBENE HEBEVORRICHTUG

Title (fr)

PALAN ACTIONNE PAR UN OUTIL DE PERCUSSION

Publication

EP 1062178 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99903090 A

Priority

  • US 9900796 W
  • US 2551998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942400A2] A hoist is constructed for powered drive by an impact tool. The hoist includes tension means for applying a force in tension to a load. Gear means are operatively associated with the tension means for producing a tension force in the tension means. The gear means include a gear element which provides a positive hold of the produced tension force when the gear means are not being driven. Impact fitting means are connected to the gear element for enabling the gear means to be power driven by an impact tool.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66D 3/18; B21F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66D 3/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66D 3/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942400 A2 19990826; WO 9942400 A3 19990930; WO 9942400 B1 19991202; AU 2319599 A 19990906; EP 1062178 A1 20001227; EP 1062178 A4 20050629

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090804

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060317

2005-06-29 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050513

2005-06-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 66D 3/18 A

2005-06-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 21F 9/00 B

2005-06-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 66D 1/00 A

2005-06-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 66D 3/18 B

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT