Global Patent Index - EP 1062187 A1

EP 1062187 A1 2000-12-27 - LOW-ENERGY SHOCK TUBE CONNECTOR SYSTEM

Title (en)

LOW-ENERGY SHOCK TUBE CONNECTOR SYSTEM

Title (de)

NIEDERENERGIEZÜNDSCHNUR - VERBINDUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE CONNECTEUR DE TUBE DE CHOC A FAIBLE PUISSANCE

Publication

EP 1062187 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99917303 A

Priority

  • US 9904846 W
  • US 7742798 P
  • US 26081899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9946221A1] A shock tube connector system comprises a substantially cylindrical detonator (B) having a longitudinal axis (15), a block body (A) receiving the detonator (B) therein, and an end cap (C). The detonator (A) includes an axisymmetric exterior shell including a cylindrical main section (10), a cylindrical explosive end portion (12) having a diameter less than the diameter of the main section (10), and a transition portion (14) connecting the main section (10) and the explosive end portion (12) of the shell. An explosive charge is contained within the explosive end portion (12) of the shell and is distributed along the longitudinal length of the explosive end portion (12). The explosive charge preferable comprises two portions (62A, 62B) of lead azide or a first charge portion (72A, 74) of lead azide and PETN and a second charge portion (72B) of PETN. An initiating shock tube (16) is operatively connected to the explosive charge via a delay element (65, 75). The block body (A) includes a housing (20) within which the main section (10) of the detonator (B) is received. A tube holder (30) connected to one end (27) of the housing (20) includes a base member (32) having a bore within which the explosive end portion (12) of the detonator (B) is received. The tube holder (30) is T-shaped and includes a pair of engaging flanges (36) spaced from the base member (32) on laterally opposite sides of the base member (32) to define therebetween pair of engaging slots (38) extending parallel to the longitudinal axis (15) of the detonator (B) and alongside the explosive end (12) of the detonator (B) received in the bore. Each engaging slot (38) is adapted to frictionally grip at least four shock tubes (D) alongside the explosive end (12) of the detonator (B) with the longitudinal axes of the shock tubes (D) substantially orthogonal to the longitudinal axis (15) of the detonator (B). The end cap (C) is connected to the other end of the housing (20) and secures the detonator (B) within the block body (A).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06C 5/00; C06C 5/06; C06C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06C 5/06 (2006.01); C06C 7/00 (2006.01); F42D 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42D 1/043 (2013.01); C06C 5/06 (2013.01); C06C 7/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9946221 A1 19990916; AU 3545599 A 19990927; CA 2322653 A1 19990916; CA 2322653 C 20080513; EP 1062187 A1 20001227; EP 1062187 A4 20080123; US 2002073870 A1 20020620; US 6305287 B1 20011023; US 6349648 B1 20020226; US 6425332 B1 20020730

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20131008

2008-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080721

2008-01-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20080102

2007-10-12 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1034503

2005-08-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 06C 5/00 A

2005-08-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 06C 5/06 B

2005-08-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 06C 7/00 B

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE