Global Patent Index - EP 1062231 A1

EP 1062231 A1 2000-12-27 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF A TETRAPEPTIDE

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF A TETRAPEPTIDE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES TETRAPEPTIDS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UN TETRAPEPTIDE

Publication

EP 1062231 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99910934 A

Priority

  • SE 9900414 W
  • SE 9800865 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947548A1] The present invention discloses a new and improved process for the preparation of the tetrapeptide H-Tyr-D-Ala-Phe(F)-Phe-NH2 which is a peptide of formula (I) or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof, as well as new intermediates in the preparation thereof. The novel process is suitable for large scale production.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 5/107; C07K 1/02; C07K 1/06; C07K 5/083

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 1/02 (2006.01); C07K 1/06 (2006.01); C07K 5/083 (2006.01); C07K 5/10 (2006.01); C07K 5/107 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 5/1016 (2013.01); C07K 5/1027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947548A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9947548 A1 19990923; AU 2968899 A 19991011; BR 9908765 A 20001107; CA 2323678 A1 19990923; CN 1300293 A 20010620; EE 200000540 A 20020215; EP 1062231 A1 20001227; HU 0102877 A2 20020128; HU 0102877 A3 20020228; ID 26938 A 20010222; IL 138244 D0 20011031; IS 5612 A 20000830; JP 2002506880 A 20020305; NO 20004613 A 20001030; NO 20004613 D0 20000915; PL 343277 A1 20010813; SE 9800865 D0 19980316; SK 13442000 A3 20010409; TR 200002652 T2 20001121; ZA 200004376 B 20011031

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-02 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1032408

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-02-26 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20021223

2003-01-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SHIRE BIOCHEM INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010725

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001016

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 20001016;LV PAYMENT 20001016;MK PAYMENT 20001016;RO PAYMENT 20001016;SI PAYMENT 20001016