Global Patent Index - EP 1062266 A1

EP 1062266 A1 2000-12-27 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING GAS OCCLUSION-FREE AND VOID-FREE COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITES

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING GAS OCCLUSION-FREE AND VOID-FREE COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITES

Title (de)

METHODE UND APPARATUR FÜR DIE PRODUKTION VON VERBINDUNGEN UND VERBUNDSTOFFEN FREI VON GASOCCLUSIONEN UND HOHLRÄUMEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR PRODUIRE DES COMPOSES ET DES COMPOSITES EXEMPTS D'OCCLUSIONS GAZEUSES ET EXEMPTS DE VIDES

Publication

EP 1062266 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98958099 A

Priority

  • US 9824818 W
  • US 6628797 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9926999A1] The present invention discloses a generic method for producing void and gas occlusion free materials, as well as apparatuses for batch and continuous production of same. This generic method can be utilized in the production of a wide variety of polymeric compounds and composites and specifically encompasses the two ends of the polymeric composite spectrum, that is, polymer concretes on the one hand, and fiber-reinforced polymer composites on the other. The composite materials of the present invention are characterized by visual count as being void and gas occlusion free to the level of 1 micron at 1250x magnification. Concomitantly, the invention produces useful polymer concrete materials which exhibit substantially improved integrity for easy machining at high speeds, and high dielectric and mechanical strength, as compared with composite materials produced by conventional methods. Thus, one particularly well-suited application for the materials of the present invention is the class of high voltage electrical insulating materials and insulators where the presence of voids, or gas occlusion flaws, may have deleterious effects, leading to their early failure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08J 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29B 7/84 (2006.01); B29B 13/00 (2006.01); B29B 15/08 (2006.01); B29C 47/10 (2006.01); B29C 67/24 (2006.01); B29C 70/02 (2006.01); B29C 70/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29B 15/08 (2013.01); B29B 7/84 (2013.01); B29B 13/00 (2013.01); B29C 47/10 (2013.01); B29C 67/242 (2013.01); B29C 70/025 (2013.01); B29C 70/48 (2013.01); B29C 47/0014 (2013.01); B29C 47/1027 (2013.01); B29C 47/1063 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9926999 A1 19990603; WO 9926999 A8 20000824; AU 1420799 A 19990615; CA 2310703 A1 19990603; EP 1062266 A1 20001227; EP 1062266 A4 20021023

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-06 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020912

2002-10-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020906

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 08J 3/00 A, 7B 29B 7/90 B, 7C 08J 5/24 B, 7B 29B 15/08 B, 7B 29C 70/02 B, 7B 29C 70/48 B, 7B 29B 13/00 B, 7B 29B 7/84 B, 7B 29C 47/10 B, 7B 29C 67/24 B

2002-03-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VIDAURRE HEIREMANS, VICTOR

2002-03-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DUFEU, L. JORGE

2002-03-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BENDEK, G. WILFREDO

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VIDAURRE HEIREMANS, VICTOR

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DEFEU, L. JORGE

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BENDEK, G. WILFREDO

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE