Global Patent Index - EP 1062302 A1

EP 1062302 A1 2000-12-27 - PROCESS FOR REDUCING TOTAL ACID NUMBER OF CRUDE OIL

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR REDUCING TOTAL ACID NUMBER OF CRUDE OIL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG DER GESAMTANZAHL VON SÄUREN IN ROHÖL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REDUCTION DE L'INDICE D'ACIDITE TOTAL DU PETROLE BRUT

Publication

EP 1062302 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98942321 A

Priority

  • US 9818041 W
  • US 92044797 A
  • US 7276498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9910453A1] The invention comprises a method for reducing the amount of carboxylic acids in petroleum feeds comprising the steps of (a) adding to said petroleum feed a catalytic agent comprising an oil soluble or oil dispersible compound of a metal selected from the group consisting of Group VB, VIB, VIIB and VIII metals, wherein the amount of metal in said petroleum feed is at least about 5 wppm, (b) heating said petroleum feed with said catalytic agent in a reactor at a temperature of about 400 to about 800 DEG F (about 204.44 to about 426.67 DEG C), under a hydrogen pressure of 15 psig to 1000 psig (204.75 to 6996.33 kPa), and (c) sweeping the reactor containing said petroleum feed and said catalytic agent with hydrogen-containing gas at a rate sufficient to maintain the combined water and carbon dioxide partial pressure below about 50 psia (about 344.75 kPa).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 45/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 45/08 (2006.01); C10G 45/04 (2006.01); C10G 45/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 45/04 (2013.01); C10G 45/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9910453A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9910453 A1 19990304; AU 733884 B2 20010531; AU 9040498 A 19990316; BR 9811387 A 20000829; CA 2295917 A1 19990304; CA 2295917 C 20050607; CN 1105769 C 20030416; CN 1268968 A 20001004; DE 69804026 D1 20020404; DE 69804026 T2 20021031; DK 1062302 T3 20020402; EP 1062302 A1 20001227; EP 1062302 B1 20020227; ID 24702 A 20000803; JP 2001514300 A 20010911; JP 4283988 B2 20090624; NO 20000948 A 20000225; NO 20000948 D0 20000225; RU 2184762 C2 20020710

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110828

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-06-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69804026

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110828

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-04-30 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2012-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110828

2012-03-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *EXXONMOBIL RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING CY

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100826

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20100708

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100708

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100831

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100819

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100818

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100809

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-02-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69804026 20020404

2002-04-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT NL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010206

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT NL