Global Patent Index - EP 1062312 A1

EP 1062312 A1 2000-12-27 - FABRIC CONDITIONING CONCENTRATE

Title (en)

FABRIC CONDITIONING CONCENTRATE

Title (de)

WÄSCHEKONDITIONIERUNGSKONZENTRAT

Title (fr)

CONCENTRE DE CONDITIONNEMENT POUR TISSUS

Publication

EP 1062312 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99936088 A

Priority

  • EP 9900497 W
  • GB 9804283 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9943777A1] The invention relates to fabric conditioning concentrate compositions comprising a fabric softening compounds mixed with oil. In use, the fabric softening concentrate is diluted with water. In order to improve the viscosity, stability and fabric softening quality provided by the emulsion, a water-soluble polymeric structurant is used. The water-soluble polymeric structurant can be suspended in the conditioning concentrate itself or it can be first of all dissolved to the final desired concentration in the water used to dilute the fabric softening concentrate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/00; C11D 1/835; C11D 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/50 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/50 (2013.01); C11D 3/0015 (2013.01); C11D 3/37 (2013.01); C11D 17/0026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943777A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9943777 A1 19990902; AR 018292 A1 20011114; AU 3251099 A 19990915; BR 9908293 A 20001031; CA 2316788 A1 19990902; CN 1174086 C 20041103; CN 1292024 A 20010418; DE 69924835 D1 20050525; DE 69924835 T2 20051117; EP 1062312 A1 20001227; EP 1062312 B1 20050420; ES 2239452 T3 20050916; GB 9804283 D0 19980422; ID 25815 A 20001109; IN 192724 B 20040515

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070126

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20060131

2007-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060127

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060126

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-04-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060123

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060127

2006-01-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060126

2005-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2239452 T3

2005-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69924835 P 20050525

2005-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2005-04-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000617

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT